DeMarke v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kevin Patrick DeMarke
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 3:2024cv00082
Filed: March 14, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2024 Filing 7 First CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Defendant Statement of Errors due by 6/24/2024. (Attachments: #1 002 Court Transcript Index, #2 003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, #3 004 Payment Documents and Decisions, #4 005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #5 006 Non Disability Related Development, #6 007 Disability Related Development, #7 008 Medical Records Part 1, #8 009 Medical Records Part 2) (Stark, John)
April 17, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: As no party has indicated on the previously issued #4 Statement as to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form that they are withholding their consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, the case will remain with the assigned Magistrate Judge for all matters, including entry of a final judgment pursuant to General Order 22-04. (jmb)
March 15, 2024 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Kevin Patrick DeMarke (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (kk2)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Certified administrative record due sixty (60) days after filing of the Complaint and SS Identification Form; Plaintiff's statement of errors due forty-five (45) days after filing of the administrative record; Defendant's response in opposition due forty-five (45) days after service of the Statement of Errors; Plaintiff may reply fifteen (15) days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/15/2024. (kk2)
March 15, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 5/14/2024 (kk2)
March 14, 2024 Filing 4 Statement As To Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form. The completed Statement As To Magistrate Jurisdiction Form shall be completed and emailed to the Court's Social Security Case Coordinator at, SSA_Coordinator@ohsd.uscourts.gov or mailed to: Office of the ClerkWalter H. Rice Federal Buildingand U.S. CourthouseRoom 712Attn: Social Security Coordinator200 W. Second StreetDayton, Ohio 45402DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE THIS DOCUMENT, IT MUST BE MAILED TO THE ABOVE ADDRESS OR EMAILED TO SSA_Coordinator@ohsd.uscourts.gov. The completed Statement As To Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form due by 4/15/2024 (jmb)
March 14, 2024 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE and GENERAL ORDER 22-04: Pursuant to #S.D. Ohio General Order 22-04, if no party indicates that they are withholding their consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, the case will remain with the assigned Magistrate Judge for all matters, including entry of a final judgment. Further, the filing of a party's statement of errors or memorandum in opposition without first filing an executed copy of the Statement as to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form will also be deemed as consent by that party to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction over all aspects of the litigation, including entry of a final judgment. (jmb)
March 14, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kevin Patrick DeMarke. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Lodged Pending Disposition of IFP Motion, #2 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeal Council Action, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Brian, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeMarke v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Patrick DeMarke
Represented By: Richard F Brian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?