Armcorp Construction, Inc. v. Talisman Casualty Insurance Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Armcorp Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Talisman Casualty Insurance Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00132
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael J Newman
Referring Judge: Peter B Silvain
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2024 Filing 11 Amended Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Defendant Talisman Casualty Insurance Company, LLC. (Strickland, Courtney) Modified docket text on 6/20/2024 (kh).
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Accordingly, Defendant Talisman Casualty Insurance Company, LLC is ORDERED to file an amended Diversity Disclosure Statement on or before June 21, 2024 that complies with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2) by disclosing the name(s) and citizenship of its member(s). IT IS SO ORDERED. Deficiency Deadline by 6/21/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr on 6/6/2024. (srb)
June 5, 2024 Filing 9 Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Defendant Talisman Casualty Insurance Company, LLC. (Strickland, Courtney)
June 5, 2024 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Talisman Casualty Insurance Company, LLC. (Strickland, Courtney)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER - This matter is before the Court upon a sua sponte review for compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a)(2). Defendant has not filed a diversity disclosure statement as required by that Rule.1 Defendant is therefore ORDERED to file such a statement no later than thirty days from the date of this Order. A sample Diversity of Citizenship Disclosure Statement is available on the Courts website. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr on 6/3/2024. (srb)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: (1) REQUIRING THE PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER; (2) REQUIRING THE PARTIES TO FILE THEIR FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) REPORT ON OR BEFORE JULY 10, 2024; AND (3) REQUIRING THE PARTIES TO MAKE INITIAL DISCLOSURES UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 26(a)(1) ON OR BEFORE JULY 3, 2024. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 6/3/2024. (srb)
May 31, 2024 Filing 5 Talisman Casualty Insurance Company, LLC ANSWER to #1 Complaint, of Armcorp Construction, Inc., filed by Talisman Casualty Insurance Company, LLC. (Strickland, Courtney)
May 30, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Nicole Strickland for Defendant Talisman Casualty Insurance Company, LLC (Strickland, Courtney)
April 30, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Talisman Casualty Insurance Company, LLC. (srb)
April 26, 2024 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Gambill, John)
April 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Talisman Casualty Insurance Company, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9941044), filed by Armcorp Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Subcontract, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Eagle Bond, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Default Termination Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 Citizenship Disclosure Statement, #7 Request to Waive Service of Summons) (Gambill, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armcorp Construction, Inc. v. Talisman Casualty Insurance Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armcorp Construction, Inc.
Represented By: John A. Gambill
Represented By: Benjamin Craig Adkins
Represented By: William J. Beckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talisman Casualty Insurance Company, LLC
Represented By: Courtney Nicole Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?