Simmons v. CoreCivic, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charlotte Simmons
Defendant: James Yates, CoreCivic, Inc. and Does 1-10
Case Number: 6:2019cv00234
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting hearing(s): Settlement Conference set for 5/6/2020 at 09:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. Settlement Conference Statements due 4/22/2020. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting scheduling order dates: Amended Pleadings due by 9/27/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 9/27/2019. Exhibit List due by 3/27/2020. Witness List due by 3/27/2020. Discovery due by 4/27/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/11/2020. Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 5/29/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/29/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 6/5/2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Jury Trial set for 6/16/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Additionally, the Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2019 at 10:15 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder is hereby STRICKEN. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Charlotte Simmons [NOTE: Attorney Robert M. Blakemore added to party Charlotte Simmons(pty:pla)]. (Blakemore, Robert)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim) by Charlotte Simmons (Smolen, Daniel)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting Scheduling Conference for 9/13/2019 at 10:15 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Parties directed to submit Joint Status Report by 9/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent or Reassignment Form) (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support by CoreCivic, Inc., James Yates Responses due by 9/3/2019(Moore, Darrell)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Darrell L. Moore on behalf of CoreCivic, Inc., James Yates (Moore, Darrell)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: James Yates - Served on 8/5/2019. by Charlotte Simmons (Smolen, Daniel)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: CoreCivic, Inc. - Served on 8/2/2019. by Charlotte Simmons (Smolen, Daniel)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to James Yates (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to CoreCivic, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/22/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1282662 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Charlotte Simmons (Smolen, Daniel)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 7/29/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against CoreCivic, Inc., Does 1-10, James Yates by Charlotte Simmons (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Charlotte Simmons (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. CoreCivic, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Yates
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreCivic, Inc.
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Simmons
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?