Okfuskee County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma, LP et al
Plaintiff: Okfuskee County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Tamerlane Rosa, Christopher Moses, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Allergan, PLC, Insys Therapeutic, Inc., Joseph Knight, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Joshua Livingston, Actavis, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Allergan Finance, LLC, Jeremy Thomas, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Purdue Pharma, LP, Roger Kinney, Walmart, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The and Tamerlane Rozsa
Case Number: 6:2019cv00300
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care - Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K. Frizzell granting #37 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel and deeming Attorney Stuart P. Ashworth withdrawn as counsel of record for defendant Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Stuart Ashworth by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. Responses due by 11/8/2019(Ashworth, Stuart)
October 23, 2019 Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Gregory K. Frizzell of the Northern District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 292(b). Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-19-300-GKF. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
October 23, 2019 Filing 35 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Don W. Danz on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Danz, Don)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder GRANTING #33 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, Defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis LLC, and Actavis Pharma, Inc., F/K/A Watson Pharma, Inc. shall file its answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint within sixty (60) days following the entry of: (1) A decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or (2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
October 9, 2019 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. Responses due by 10/23/2019(Quinn, Ashley)
October 8, 2019 Filing 32 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert G. McCampbell on behalf of Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (McCampbell, Robert)
October 8, 2019 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying Corporate Parents Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. and Cupric Holding Co., Inc. for Cephalon, Inc.; Corporate Parents Orvet UK Unlimited, Teva Pharmaceuticals Europe B.V., and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Other Affiliates Teva Pharmaceutical Holdings Cooperatieve U.A. and IVAX LLC for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actvais, LLC, and Watson Laboratories, Inc.) by Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Quinn, Ashley) Modified on 10/9/2019: added corporate parents and other affiliates and edited text (nm, Deputy Clerk).
October 8, 2019 Filing 30 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ashley E. Quinn on behalf of Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Quinn, Ashley)
October 2, 2019 Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing parties to submit a completed Consent/District Judge Option form within fourteen (14) days. Consent forms provided to parties (ndd, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 10/2/2019 to reflect Minute Order entered by Court Clerk (ndd, Deputy Clerk).
September 25, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Lester C. Houtz to file by 10/09/2019 an Application for Admission or Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice per Local Civil Rules 83.2 and 83.3 (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder GRANTING #26 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, Defendants McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation shall file its answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint within sixty (60) days following the entry of: (1) A decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or (2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
September 19, 2019 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation Responses due by 10/3/2019(Campbell, Stuart)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder GRANTING #20 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., AND #24 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by Walmart, Inc. Accordingly, Defendants Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. and Walmart, Inc. shall file its answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint within forty-five (45) days following the entry of: (1) A decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or (2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2019 Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Petition (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Walmart, Inc. Responses due by 9/27/2019(Ottaway, Larry)
September 13, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Larry D. Ottaway on behalf of Walmart, Inc. (Ottaway, Larry)
September 13, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amy Sherry Fischer on behalf of Walmart, Inc. (Fischer, Amy)
September 13, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jordyn Cartmell on behalf of Walmart, Inc. (Cartmell, Jordyn)
September 12, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. [NOTE: Attorney Stuart P. Ashworth added to party Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.(pty:dft)]. Responses due by 9/26/2019(Ashworth, Stuart)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder GRANTING #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Accordingly, Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., and the Purdue Frederick Company Inc. (Purdue) shall file its answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint within sixty (60) days following the entry of: (1) A decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or (2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc. for Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The) by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The (Way, Evan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliates Purdue Pharma Inc. and Pharmaceutical Research Associates L.P. by Purdue Pharma, LP (Way, Evan) Modified on 9/13/2019: added Other Affiliates (nm, Deputy Clerk).
September 11, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP Responses due by 9/25/2019(Way, Evan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL Notice of Removal (Re: #2 Notice of Removal) by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP (With attachments)(Way, Evan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Evan Way on behalf of Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP (Way, Evan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A. Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Endo International PLC by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray) Modified on 9/9/2019: added corporate parent (nm, Deputy Clerk).
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Endo International PLC by Endo Health Solutions, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray) Modified on 9/9/2019: added corporate parent (nm, Deputy Clerk).
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ray E. Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation (Campbell, Stuart)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stuart D. Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Campbell, Stuart)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D. Michael McBride, III on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (McBride, D.)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Susan E. Huntsman on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
September 6, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 9/6/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1297010 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by McKesson Corporation (Campbell, Stuart)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 9/13/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Okfuskee County District Court, case number CJ-19-021 by McKesson Corporation (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by McKesson Corporation (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan Finance, LLC, Allergan, PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutic, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Roger Kinney, Joseph Knight, Joshua Livingston, Mallinckrodt, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Christopher Moses, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP, Tamerlane Rosa, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Jeremy Thomas, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Okfuskee County Board of County Commissioners (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Okfuskee County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Lester C. Houtz
Represented By: Stuart P. Ashworth
Represented By: Don W. Danz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Kaylee Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Ray E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamerlane Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Sanford C. Coats
Represented By: Evan Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutic, Inc.
Represented By: Joe M. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley E. Quinn
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Ray E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Represented By: Ashley E. Quinn
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley E. Quinn
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley E. Quinn
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Lester C. Houtz
Represented By: Stuart P. Ashworth
Represented By: Don W. Danz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley E. Quinn
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Thomas
Represented By: James W. Connor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: D. Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E. Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, LP
Represented By: Sanford C. Coats
Represented By: Evan Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Larry D. Ottaway
Represented By: Jordyn Cartmell
Represented By: Amy Sherry Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
Represented By: Sanford C. Coats
Represented By: Evan Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamerlane Rozsa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Okfuskee County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: George Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?