Coal County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma, LP et al
Plaintiff: Coal County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Anda, Inc., Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Morris & Dickson Co., LLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Allergan, PLC, Purdue Frederick Company, The, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Keysource Medical, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis, PLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., McKesson Corp., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Purdue Pharma, LP, Watson Pharma, Inc., Physicians Total Care, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, GCP Pharma, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, SAJ Distributors, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. and CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00405
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: James H Payne
Referring Judge: Kimberly E West
2 Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West GRANTING #39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond. Accordingly, Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C., and Walgreens Boots Alliance shall file their answers or other responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint not later than forty five (45) days following the later of the final determination of any motion to remand or transfer of this action to the MDL Panel. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
January 3, 2020 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 1/17/2020(Evans, Kyle)
December 31, 2019 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. Responses due by 1/14/2020(White, Amy)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (Docket Entry #33 ) is hereby GRANTED. Ashley E. Quinn is deemed WITHDRAWN from further representation of Defendants Anda, Inc. and Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in this action.(adw, Deputy Clerk)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne referring case to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West pursuant to 28 USC 636(b)(1)(A) for final determination of all non-dispositive matters arising in the case. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-19-405-JHP-KEW.(adw, Deputy Clerk)
December 23, 2019 Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk - Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge James H. Payne. Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV 19-405-JHP. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
December 19, 2019 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD for Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.) by Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Evans, Kyle)
December 19, 2019 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD for Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc.) by Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (Evans, Kyle)
December 19, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) by Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. Responses due by 1/2/2020(Quinn, Ashley)
December 19, 2019 Filing 32 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kyle D. Evans on behalf of Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc. (Evans, Kyle)
December 19, 2019 Filing 31 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kyle D. Evans on behalf of Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (Evans, Kyle)
December 19, 2019 Filing 30 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert G. McCampbell on behalf of Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc. (McCampbell, Robert)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2019 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Responses due by 12/26/2019(Riddles, D.)
December 10, 2019 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Riddles, D.)
December 10, 2019 Filing 26 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D. Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Riddles, D.)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Moving Defendants' Unopposed Amended Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings filed by Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc.; Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Allergan plc f/k/a Actavis plc; Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc; Johnson & Johnson; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Mallinckrodt LLC; Watson Laboratories, Inc.; Actavis Pharma, Inc.; Actavis, LLC; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Cephalon, Inc.; Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. (Docket Entry #23 ) is hereby GRANTED. The Moving Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Petition sixty (60) days following 1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action; or 2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later. The original Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings filed by these Defendants (Docket Entry #21 ) is deemed MOOT due to the filing of the Amended Motion. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Defendants McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., The Harvard Drug Group, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, and H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company (Docket Entry #20 ) is hereby GRANTED. The Moving Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Petition sixty (60) days following 1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action; or 2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later.(adw, Deputy Clerk)
December 4, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Amending Doc 21) (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint,,,, ) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Responses due by 12/18/2019(Zschiesche, Ray)
December 4, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk : Pursuant to the recusal of Judge Ronald A. White and at the direction of the Court, this case is hereby randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-19-405-KEW.(lal, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or to File Responsive Pleadings (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Responses due by 12/17/2019(Zschiesche, Ray)
December 3, 2019 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, McKesson Corp. Responses due by 12/17/2019(Campbell, Stuart)
November 27, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Health Solutions, Inc.) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray)
November 27, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.) by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray)
November 27, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ray E. Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray)
November 27, 2019 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENTAL Notice in Support of Removal (Re: #2 Notice of Removal) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (With attachments)(Zschiesche, Ray)
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D. Michael McBride, III on behalf of H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. (McBride, D.)
November 27, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D. Michael McBride, III on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (McBride, D.)
November 27, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Susan E. Huntsman on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent H. D. Smith Holdings, LLC for H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.) by H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. (Huntsman, Susan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Susan E. Huntsman on behalf of H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. (Huntsman, Susan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Corporate Parent Generic Drug Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent HDG Acquisition, Inc., Corporate Parent Cardinal Health, Inc. for Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The) by Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The (Ray, Ryan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A. Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The (Ray, Ryan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A. Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
November 27, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 11/27/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1321049 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal) by McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stuart D. Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 12/4/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Coal County District Court, case number CJ-19-011 by McKesson Corp. (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/27/2019: #37 Exhibit 37 Ret of Svc- Janssen, #38 Exhibit 38 - Ret of Svc - Mallinkcrodt, #39 Exhibit 39 - Ret of Svc - Morris, #40 Exhibit 40 - Ret of Svc - Ortho, #41 Exhibit 41 - Ret of Svc - Physicians, #42 Exhibit 42 - Ret of Svc - Purdue, #43 Exhibit 43 - Ret of Svc - Purdue Pharma, #44 Exhibit 44 - Ret of Svc - Purdue, #45 Exhibit 45 - Ret of svc - Quest, #46 Exhibit 46 - Ret of Svc - SAJ, #47 Exhibit 47 - Ret of Svc - Walgreens, #48 Exhibit 48 - Order - McKesson, #49 Exhibit 49- Order - Quest, #50 Exhibit 50 - Mtn - McKesson, #51 Exhibit 51 - Mtn - Quest) (jcb, Deputy Clerk).
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by McKesson Corp. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
June 25, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Actavis, PLC, Allergan, PLC, AmerisourceBergen Corp., Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., GCP Pharma, LLC, H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Keysource Medical, Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corp., Morris & Dickson Co., LLC, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Physicians Total Care, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, The, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP, Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SAJ Distributors, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Coal County Board of County Commissioners (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coal County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Don W. Danz
Represented By: Steven E. Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Ray E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley E. Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Curran
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley E. Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Curran
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Ray E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: D. Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Don W. Danz
Represented By: Steven E. Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Represented By: D. Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E. Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp.
Represented By: Kaylee Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: D. Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E. Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAJ Distributors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coal County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Matthew J. Sill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?