Chickasaw Nation v. McKesson Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Chickasaw Nation
Defendant: Cardinal Health 105, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, McKesson Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Walgreen Co., Cardinal Health, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Cardinal Health 108, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Corp. and Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00178
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care - Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 ***Remark: Transferred case opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:20-op-45201 (Re: #25 Order, Transferring Case ) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 10, 2020 Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to the recusal of District Judge John F. Heil, III and at the direction of the Court, this case is randomly reassigned to District Judge Ronald A. White. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-20-178-RAW. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
July 6, 2020 Filing 25 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (FINALIZED) (CTO-163) transferring case to the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (case terminated) (lal, Deputy Clerk)
July 6, 2020 Filing 23 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-163) from United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2020 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge John F. Heil, III. Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-20-178-JFH. (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder GRANTING #20 Defendants McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cardinal Health 105, Inc., Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Corp, and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Petition. (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
June 22, 2020 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by AmerisourceBergen Corp., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 105, Inc., Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation Responses due by 7/6/2020(Campbell, Stuart)
June 18, 2020 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Other Affiliate Walgreens Boots Alliance Holdings LLC for AmerisourceBergen Corp.) by AmerisourceBergen Corp. (Huntsman, Susan) Modified on 6/18/2020: changed corporate parent to other affiliate (nm, Deputy Clerk).
June 16, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Reggie N. Whitten on behalf of Chickasaw Nation (Whitten, Reggie)
June 16, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Burrage on behalf of Chickasaw Nation (Burrage, Michael)
June 15, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Cardinal Health, Inc. for Cardinal Health 110, LLC) by Cardinal Health 110, LLC (Ray, Ryan)
June 15, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Cardinal Health, Inc. for Cardinal Health 108, LLC) by Cardinal Health 108, LLC (Ray, Ryan) Modified on 6/16/2020: corrected corporate parent (nm, Deputy Clerk).
June 15, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Cardinal Health, Inc. for Cardinal Health 105, Inc.) by Cardinal Health 105, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
June 15, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A. Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health 110, LLC (Ray, Ryan)
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A. Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health 108, LLC (Ray, Ryan)
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A. Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health 105, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A. Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D. Michael McBride, III on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Corp., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (McBride, D.)
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Susan E. Huntsman on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Corp., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
June 10, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 6/10/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1372376 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by McKesson Corporation (Campbell, Stuart)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 6/17/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation (Campbell, Stuart)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stuart D. Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Campbell, Stuart)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Pontotoc County District Court, case number CJ-2020-079 by McKesson Corporation (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by McKesson Corporation (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2020 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against AmerisourceBergen Corp., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Cardinal Health 105, Inc., Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. by Chickasaw Nation (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chickasaw Nation v. McKesson Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 105, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Amy D. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Kaylee Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Susan E. Huntsman
Represented By: Michael D. McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Amy D. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Steven E. Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Steven E. Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Jordyn Cartmell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 108, LLC
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corp.
Represented By: Susan E. Huntsman
Represented By: Michael D. McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Amy D. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chickasaw Nation
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?