Mathieu v. Robertson
Plaintiff: James Mathieu
Defendant: Colton Robertson
Case Number: 6:2021cv00287
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi Warmbrod Dishman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFIED MAIL Return Receipt Received showing receipt of 9 Minute Order (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West: In accordance with the referral of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Docket Entry #4 ), this Court has reviewed the Motion but is unable to evaluate its merit due to a lack of required information. As a result, Plaintiff shall complete and file the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis form, including the accompanying affidavit, which is found at this Court's website at https://www.oked.uscourts.gov/forms/motion-proceed-forma-pauperis-non-prisoner no later than NOVEMBER 3, 2021. Upon the filing of this Motion, this Court will evaluate Plaintiff's financial condition for in forma pauperis status under 28 U.S.C. 1915. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Jodi Warmbrod Dishman referring Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed 9/17/2021 (Re: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis) to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West for Findings and Recommendations pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 636(b)(1).(kch, Deputy Clerk)
September 21, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Jodi Warmbrod Dishman of the Western District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 292(b). All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-21-287-JWD. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Texas Northern
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to Division of Eastern District of Oklahoma. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 9/21/2021) (mcrd) [Transferred from txnd on 9/21/2021.]
September 21, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Tue Sep 21 08:42:56 CDT 2021 (crt) [Transferred from txnd on 9/21/2021.]
September 20, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Mon Sep 20 15:52:30 CDT 2021 (crt) [Transferred from txnd on 9/21/2021.]
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Mathieu. (mla) [Transferred from txnd on 9/21/2021.]
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Colton Robertson filed by James Mathieu. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mla) [Transferred from txnd on 9/21/2021.]
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mla) [Transferred from txnd on 9/21/2021.]
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla) [Transferred from txnd on 9/21/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathieu v. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Mathieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colton Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?