Price v. Broken Arrow, City of et al
Plaintiff: Harold Price
Defendant: Broken Arrow, City of, Michael Spurgeon, Kenneth Schwab, Debra Wimpee, Craig Thurmond, Christie Gillespie, Scott Eudey, Johnnie Parks, Bobby Joe LaFaver, Patricia Lafaver, Jennifer Hooks, Joe Williford, Jeremy Moore, Brandon Berryhill, Jill Ferenc and Christi Gillespie
Case Number: 6:2023cv00437
Filed: December 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2024 Filing 53 REPLY to Response to Motion - TITLED Fourteenth Amendment Requires Equal Treatment Under Law, Defendant Clearly Has Presented Misleading Information as to the Mailing Date (Re: #50 MOTION for Default Judgment against Bobby Joe and Patricia Lafaver ) by Harold Price (eaw, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2024 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #50 MOTION for Default Judgment against Bobby Joe and Patricia Lafaver ) by Bobby Joe LaFaver, Patricia Lafaver ;(LaCourse, Joel)
February 14, 2024 Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss Claims against Defendants Craig Thurmond, Scott Eudey, Jennifer Hooks and Jill Ferenc as Defendants are no longer employed by the Defendant, City of Broken Arrow by Harold Price (With attachments) Responses due by 2/28/2024 (eaw, Deputy Clerk)
February 2, 2024 Filing 50 MOTION for Default Judgment against Bobby Joe and Patricia Lafaver by Harold Price Responses due by 2/16/2024 (eaw, Deputy Clerk)
February 1, 2024 Filing 49 RESPONSE declining invitation to amend the complaint by Harold Price. (With attachments) (Re: #43 Order)(tls, Deputy Clerk)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White Plaintiff is invited, if he so desires, to file an amended complaint by 2/6/2024 providing additional legal or factual averments which may vitiate the Defendants' claims of insufficiency. (Re: #45 Motion to Dismiss) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
January 29, 2024 Filing 47 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #38 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION for More Definite Statement, #41 JOINDER in Motion, #39 JOINDER in Motion, #45 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim ) by Harold Price (eaw, Deputy Clerk)
January 29, 2024 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted re: Craig Thurmond by Harold Price (eaw, Deputy Clerk)
January 26, 2024 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim by Bobby Joe LaFaver, Patricia Lafaver (With attachments) Responses due by 2/9/2024(LaCourse, Joel)
January 26, 2024 Filing 44 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joel A. LaCourse on behalf of Bobby Joe LaFaver, Patricia Lafaver (LaCourse, Joel)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White inviting Plaintiff, if he so desires, to file an Amended Complaint by 2/6/2024 providing additional legal or factual averments which may vitiate the Defendants claims of insufficiency. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2024 Filing 42 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rachel A. Fields on behalf of Scott Eudey, Jill Ferenc, Jennifer Hooks, Craig Thurmond (Fields, Rachel)
January 24, 2024 Filing 41 JOINDER in Motion (Re: #38 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative, MOTION for More Definite Statement) by Scott Eudey, Jill Ferenc, Jennifer Hooks, Craig Thurmond (Thoreson, Rhiannon)
January 24, 2024 Filing 40 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rhiannon Thoreson on behalf of Scott Eudey, Jill Ferenc, Jennifer Hooks, Craig Thurmond (Thoreson, Rhiannon)
January 23, 2024 Filing 39 JOINDER in Motion (Re: #38 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative, MOTION for More Definite Statement) by Brandon Berryhill, Christi Gillespie, Jeremy Moore, Johnnie Parks, Kenneth Schwab, Michael Spurgeon(City Manager in his individual capacity), Michael Spurgeon(City Manager in his official capacity), Joe Williford, Debra Wimpee (Thoreson, Rhiannon)
January 23, 2024 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Broken Arrow, City of Responses due by 2/6/2024 (Thoreson, Rhiannon). Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 1/28/2024 (dma, Deputy Clerk).
January 23, 2024 Filing 37 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rachel A. Fields on behalf of Brandon Berryhill, Broken Arrow, City of, Christi Gillespie, Jeremy Moore, Johnnie Parks, Kenneth Schwab, Michael Spurgeon(City Manager in his individual capacity), Michael Spurgeon(City Manager in his official capacity), Joe Williford, Debra Wimpee (Fields, Rachel)
January 23, 2024 Filing 36 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rhiannon Thoreson on behalf of Brandon Berryhill, Broken Arrow, City of, Christi Gillespie, Jeremy Moore, Johnnie Parks, Kenneth Schwab, Michael Spurgeon(City Manager in his individual capacity), Michael Spurgeon(City Manager in his official capacity), Joe Williford, Debra Wimpee (Thoreson, Rhiannon)
January 16, 2024 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Jeremy Moore - Served on 1/8/2024 by Harold Price (eaw, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2024 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Brandon Berryhill - Served on 1/8/2024 by Harold Price (eaw, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2024 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Joe Williford - Served on 1/5/2024 by Harold Price (eaw, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2024 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Jill Ference - Served on 1/8/2024 by Harold Price (eaw, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2024 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Scott Eudey - Served on 1/8/2024 by Harold Price (eaw, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2024 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Jennifer Hooks - Served on 1/8/2024 by Harold Price (eaw, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2024 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Patricia Lafaver - Served on 1/5/2024 by Harold Price (eaw, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2024 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Broken Arrow, City of - Served on 1/5/2024 by Harold Price (eaw, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2024 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Michael Spurgeon (City Manager in his individual capacity) - Served on 1/8/2024; Michael Spurgeon (City Manager in his official capacity) - Served on 1/8/2024 by Harold Price (eaw, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2024 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Kenneth Schwab - Served on 1/5/2024 by Harold Price (eaw, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2024 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Debra Wimpee - Served on 1/8/2024 by Harold Price (eaw, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2024 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Christi Gillespie - Served on 1/8/2024 by Harold Price (eaw, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2024 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Johnnie Parks - Served on 1/8/2024 by Harold Price (eaw, Deputy Clerk)
January 9, 2024 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Harold Price. (With attachments)(rak, Deputy Clerk)
January 9, 2024 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Harold Price. (With attachments)(rak, Deputy Clerk)
January 9, 2024 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Harold Price. (With attachments)(rak, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2023 Filing 19 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Debra Wimpee. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Craig Thurmond. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Patricia Lafaver. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Jennifer Hooks. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Johnnie Parks. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Jill Ferenc. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Kenneth Schwab. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Broken Arrow, City of. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Jeremy Moore. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Christie Gillespie. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Scott Eudey. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Brandon Berryhill. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Bobby Joe LaFaver. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Michael Spurgeon(City Manager in his individual capacity ), Michael Spurgeon(City Manager in his official capacity). (jld, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Joe Williford. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2023 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk Applicable parties are directed to file Disclosure Statements per FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Court's website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(jld, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2023 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk The parties are advised that this case has been assigned to a U.S. District Judge. A U. S. Magistrate Judge can conduct all proceedings in this case including trial in accordance with 28 U.S.C, Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 should the parties consent. Consent may be exercised by completing the Consent Form (Civil Case Originally Assigned to District Judge) on this Court's website at # https://www.oked.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil in accordance with the procedure outlined therein. Completed forms should be submitted in PDF format to Consents_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov within twenty-one days.(jld, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Brandon Berryhill, Broken Arrow, City of, Scott Eudey, Jill Ferenc, Christi Gillespie, Jennifer Hooks, Bobby Joe LaFaver, Patricia Lafaver, Jeremy Moore, Johnnie Parks, Kenneth Schwab, Michael Spurgeon (City Manager in his individual capacity), Michael Spurgeon (City Manager in his official capacity), Craig Thurmond, Joe Williford and Debra Wimpee by Harold Price. (jld, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 1/2/2024 to add party (dma, Deputy Clerk).
December 28, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Harold Price. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2023 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 12/28/2023 in the amount of $405, receipt number 21810 by Harold Price. (Re: #2 Complaint) (jld, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Broken Arrow, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broken Arrow, City of
Represented By: Rachel A. Fields
Represented By: Rhiannon Thoreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Spurgeon
Represented By: Rhiannon Thoreson
Represented By: Rachel A. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Schwab
Represented By: Rachel A. Fields
Represented By: Rhiannon Thoreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Wimpee
Represented By: Rhiannon Thoreson
Represented By: Rachel A. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Thurmond
Represented By: Rachel A. Fields
Represented By: Rhiannon Thoreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christie Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Eudey
Represented By: Rachel A. Fields
Represented By: Rhiannon Thoreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnnie Parks
Represented By: Rachel A. Fields
Represented By: Rhiannon Thoreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Joe LaFaver
Represented By: Joel A. LaCourse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Lafaver
Represented By: Joel A. LaCourse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Hooks
Represented By: Rhiannon Thoreson
Represented By: Rachel A. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Williford
Represented By: Rachel A. Fields
Represented By: Rhiannon Thoreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Moore
Represented By: Rachel A. Fields
Represented By: Rhiannon Thoreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Berryhill
Represented By: Rachel A. Fields
Represented By: Rhiannon Thoreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Ferenc
Represented By: Rachel A. Fields
Represented By: Rhiannon Thoreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christi Gillespie
Represented By: Rhiannon Thoreson
Represented By: Rachel A. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?