Patterson v. CoreCivic, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carl Patterson
Defendant: CoreCivic, Inc., Joseph Norwood, Connor Whitlock, Robert Choate and Steven Eller
Case Number: 6:2024cv00052
Filed: February 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: D Edward Snow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2024 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: CoreCivic, Inc. - Served on 3/18/2024 by Carl Patterson (Warren, John)
April 2, 2024 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: CoreCivic, Inc. - Served on 3/8/2024 by Carl Patterson (Warren, John)
April 2, 2024 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Joseph Norwood - Served on 3/11/2024 by Carl Patterson (Warren, John)
April 2, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Robert Choate - Served on 3/11/2024 by Carl Patterson (Warren, John)
March 25, 2024 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by CoreCivic, Inc., Joseph Norwood (Moore, Darrell)
March 25, 2024 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CoreCivic, Inc. (Moore, Darrell)
March 25, 2024 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Darrell L. Moore on behalf of CoreCivic, Inc., Joseph Norwood (Moore, Darrell)
February 26, 2024 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carl Patterson (Warren, John)
February 12, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Connor Whitlock. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Joseph Norwood. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Steven Eller. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Robert Choate. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to CoreCivic, Inc. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2024 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk Applicable parties are directed to file Disclosure Statements per FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Court's website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(jld, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2024 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk The parties are advised that this case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial should all parties consent to jurisdiction. Consent or election of a District Judge Option may be exercised by completing the Consent Form (Civil Case Originally Assigned to Magistrate Judge) on this Court's website at # https://www.oked.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil in accordance with the procedure outlined therein. If a party does not wish to consent to such jurisdiction, they must complete the Reassignment section. Completed forms should be submitted in PDF format to Consents_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov within twenty-one days.(Miscellaneous Deadline set for 3/4/2024)(jld, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2024 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $405 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. (Filing Fee due by 2/20/2024) (Re: #2 Complaint) (jld, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Robert Choate, CoreCivic, Inc., Steven Eller, Joseph Norwood, Connor Whitlock by Carl Patterson. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Carl Patterson. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2024 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 2/12/2024 in the amount of $405, receipt number AOKEDC-1905162 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Carl Patterson (Warren, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. CoreCivic, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Patterson
Represented By: John W. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreCivic, Inc.
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Norwood
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connor Whitlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Choate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Eller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?