City of Broken Arrow v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Broken Arrow
Defendant: Insys Therapeutic, Inc., Anda, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Morris & Dickson Co, LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Perry Fine, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Actavis PLC, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Keysource Medical, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Joshua Livingston, Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corp., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Russel Portenoy, Purdue Pharma Inc., McKesson Corp., Lynn Webster, Watson Pharma, Inc., Physicians Total Care, Inc., GCP Pharma, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The and Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00047
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Referring Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 69 Joint BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #55 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation ) by AmerisourceBergen Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corp. ; (Campbell, Stuart)
March 22, 2019 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #51 MOTION to Remand ) by City of Broken Arrow ; (Court, Todd)
March 15, 2019 Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #55 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation ) by City of Broken Arrow ; (With attachments) (Court, Todd)
March 14, 2019 Filing 66 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #51 MOTION to Remand ) by McKesson Corp. ; (With attachments) (Campbell, Stuart)
March 14, 2019 Filing 65 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #51 MOTION to Remand ) by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. ; (Zschiesche, Raymond)
March 7, 2019 Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
March 6, 2019 Filing 63 Amended CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Other Affiliate Walgreens Boots Alliance Holdings LLC for AmerisourceBergen Corp.) by AmerisourceBergen Corp. (Huntsman, Susan)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; granting #61 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) (pll, Dpty Clk)
March 5, 2019 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or File Responsive Pleading (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The (Ray, Ryan)
March 5, 2019 Filing 60 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Cardinal Health, Inc., Corporate Parent Generic Drug Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent HDG Acquisition, Inc., Corporate Parent Cardinal Health 110, LLC for Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The) by Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The (Ray, Ryan)
March 5, 2019 Filing 59 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The [Note: Attorney Ryan A Ray added to party Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The(pty:dft).] (Ray, Ryan)
February 27, 2019 Filing 58 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent TEVA Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD for Anda, Inc.) by Anda, Inc. (Curran, Jeffrey)
February 27, 2019 Filing 57 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent TEVA Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD for Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.) by Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Curran, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Briefing (Doc. 54) is hereby granted. Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Briefing (Doc. 52) is denied. Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc. 51) shall be filed on or before March 14, 2019. Plaintiff may file an expedited Reply if it desires. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 3/14/2019, Replies due by 3/28/2019); granting #54 Motion to Reconsider (Re: #51 MOTION to Remand , #52 MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (MOTION FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
February 25, 2019 Filing 55 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by AmerisourceBergen Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corp. (With attachments) (Campbell, Stuart)
February 25, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION to Reconsider Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Briefing (Re: #53 Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s), ) by AmerisourceBergen Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 2/28/2019, Replies due by 3/4/2019); granting #52 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #51 MOTION to Remand ) (lmc, Chambers)
February 21, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (MOTION FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING) (Re: #51 MOTION to Remand ) by City of Broken Arrow (Court, Todd)
February 21, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION to Remand by City of Broken Arrow (With attachments) (Court, Todd)
February 21, 2019 Filing 50 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Allen Curran on behalf of Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. [Note: Attorney Jeffrey Allen Curran added to party Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Allen Curran added to party Anda, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Curran, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Tiffany M. Ikeda and John D. Lombardo are admitted Pro Hac Vice for Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. ; ; granting #47 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #48 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (lmc, Chambers)
February 21, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Attorney(s) John D. Lombardo to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-2018989) by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (With attachments) (Zschiesche, Raymond)
February 21, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Attorney(s) Tiffany M. Ikeda to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-2018986) by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (With attachments) (Zschiesche, Raymond)
February 19, 2019 Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Anda, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern regarding Anda Defendants response to Petition. ; granting #44 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (lmc, Chambers)
February 14, 2019 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Move, or Otherwise Respond (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (Hemphill, Lisa)
February 14, 2019 Filing 43 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lisa Renee Hemphill on behalf of Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. [Note: Attorney Lisa Renee Hemphill added to party Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa Renee Hemphill added to party Anda, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Hemphill, Lisa)
February 14, 2019 Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Cephalon Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
February 13, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: filer selected in error (Watson Pharma, Inc.); Correction: removed filer selected in error (Re: #40 Appearance - Attorney, ) (srt, Dpty Clk)
February 13, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong filer selected; Correction: removed filer selected in error (Watson Pharma, Inc.) and added correct filer (Watson Laboratories, Inc.) (Re: #39 Appearance - Attorney,, ) (srt, Dpty Clk)
February 12, 2019 Filing 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent TEVA Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD for Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.) by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Merkley, Nicholas)
February 12, 2019 Filing 40 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Nicholas Vernon Merkley on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., [Note: Attorney Nicholas Vernon Merkley added to party Watson Pharma, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Merkley, Nicholas) Modified on 2/13/2019 to remove filer selected in error (Watson Pharma, Inc.) (srt, Dpty Clk).
February 12, 2019 Filing 39 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ashley E Quinn on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc. [Note: Attorney Ashley E Quinn added to party Actavis LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley E Quinn added to party Actavis Pharma, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley E Quinn added to party Cephalon Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley E Quinn added to party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley E Quinn added to party Watson Laboratories, Inc. (pty:dft).] (Quinn, Ashley) Modified on 2/13/2019 - removed filer selected in error (Watson Pharma, Inc.) and added correct filer (Watson Laboratories, Inc.) (srt, Dpty Clk).
February 11, 2019 Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc. for Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The) by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The (Lamirand, Jennifer)
February 11, 2019 Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Purdue Pharma Inc. (Lamirand, Jennifer)
February 11, 2019 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Purdue Pharma L.P. (Lamirand, Jennifer)
February 11, 2019 Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
February 8, 2019 Filing 34 ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #30 Notice (Other) ) by McKesson Corp. (With attachments) (Campbell, Stuart)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Defendant Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (Doc. 32) is hereby granted. The time for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Petition is hereby extended until 45 days following (1) a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action or (2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later. ; granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
February 8, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition under Rule 12 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Riddles, D)
February 8, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Notice - Other); Correction: changed text to reflect correct event (Amended NOTICE of Removal) (Re: #30 Notice (Other) ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
February 8, 2019 Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P. [ to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
February 7, 2019 Filing 30 Amended NOTICE of Removal (Re: #2 NOTICE of Removal) by McKesson Corp. (With attachments) (Campbell, Stuart) Modified on 2/8/2019 to change text to reflect correct event and add link (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
February 7, 2019 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Riddles, D)
February 7, 2019 Filing 28 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. [Note: Attorney D Todd Riddles added to party Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Riddles, D)
February 7, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
February 6, 2019 Filing 26 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jennifer Nicole Lamirand on behalf of Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P. [Note: Attorney Jennifer Nicole Lamirand added to party Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Nicole Lamirand added to party Purdue Pharma Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Nicole Lamirand added to party Purdue Pharma L.P.(pty:dft).] (Lamirand, Jennifer)
February 6, 2019 Filing 25 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sanford C Coats on behalf of Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P. (Coats, Sanford)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Manufacturer Defendants' answer or responsive pleading due 45 days after ruling on any motion to remand or transfer case to MDL Panel. ; granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (lmc, Chambers)
February 5, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Ridgeway, Michael)
February 5, 2019 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.) by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Ridgeway, Michael)
February 5, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael W Ridgeway on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Ridgeway, Michael)
February 5, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Hunt Sparks on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Sparks, John)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Defendants McKesson, Cardinal Health, Inc., and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation's answer or responsive pleading due 45 days after ruling on any motion to remand or transfer case to MDL Panel. ; granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (lmc, Chambers)
February 4, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by AmerisourceBergen Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
January 31, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kaylee Patricia Davis-Maddy on behalf of McKesson Corp. (Davis-Maddy, Kaylee)
January 31, 2019 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 31, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing John Lombardo and Tiffany Ikeda to file by 2/21/2019 a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice per Local Civil Rule 83.2. Additionally, if you intend to practice in this district in the future and want to become a member of this district, please submit an application for attorney admission. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (eaw, Dpty Clk)
January 31, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
January 31, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stuart Douglas Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
January 30, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
January 30, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.) by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc.) by Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Raymond Edward Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 30, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AmerisourceBergen Corp. (Huntsman, Susan)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Corp. (Huntsman, Susan)
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Corp. (McBride, D)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., McKesson Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc. and AmerisourceBergen Corp. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
January 30, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , : Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, the removing party(ies) shall file a Status Report on Removed Action within five (5) days of the filing of the notice of removal in the U.S. District Court. The form is available on the Court's website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from District Court of Tulsa County, case number CJ-2019-00063 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2008388) by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (With attachments) (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 7, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by City of Broken Arrow (jln, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Broken Arrow v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutic, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph L Franco
Represented By: J Matthew Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Curran
Represented By: Lisa Renee Hemphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Represented By: Jennifer Nicole Lamirand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Rocky C Tsai
Represented By: Jennifer Pantina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Curran
Represented By: Lisa Renee Hemphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Represented By: Robert Alan Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Represented By: Brian M Ercole
Represented By: Harvey Bartle, IV
Represented By: Steven A Reed
Represented By: Robert Garner McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas Vernon Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M Ercole
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Harvey Bartle, IV
Represented By: Steven A Reed
Represented By: Robert Garner McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas Vernon Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany Ikeda
Represented By: John Lombardo
Represented By: Raymond Edward Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Brian M Ercole
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Harvey Bartle, IV
Represented By: Steven A Reed
Represented By: Robert Garner McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas Vernon Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: D Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Brian M Ercole
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Harvey Bartle, IV
Represented By: Steven A Reed
Represented By: Robert Garner McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas Vernon Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M Ercole
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Harvey Bartle, IV
Represented By: Steven A Reed
Represented By: Robert Garner McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas Vernon Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M Ercole
Represented By: Harvey Bartle, IV
Represented By: Steven A Reed
Represented By: Robert Garner McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas Vernon Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corp.
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany Ikeda
Represented By: John Lombardo
Represented By: Raymond Edward Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: John Hunt Sparks
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: Charles C Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russel Portenoy
Represented By: S Amy Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Represented By: Jennifer Nicole Lamirand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp.
Represented By: Kaylee Patricia Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart Douglas Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John Hunt Sparks
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: Charles C Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: John Hunt Sparks
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: Charles C Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Represented By: Jennifer Nicole Lamirand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John Hunt Sparks
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: Charles C Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Broken Arrow
Represented By: Todd A Court
Represented By: Tony G Puckett
Represented By: Harrison Cole Lujan
Represented By: Matthew James Sill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?