Cox v. State of Oklahoma, The et al
Plaintiff: Dawn Jane Cox
Defendant: State of Oklahoma, The, City of Tulsa, Jenny Remy, Aubrie Thompson and Chuck Jordan
Case Number: 4:2019cv00483
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss Party The State of Oklahoma ex rel The Oklahoma Department of Human Services ) by Dawn Jane Cox ; (Pence, Elizabeth)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Based on #12 , if Ms. Cowley intends to withdraw as counsel for plaintiff, she must file a motion to withdraw. Further, the unopposed motion #12 is granted in part. Plantiff's response to #6 motion to dismiss is due no later than 10/22/19; Reply due 11/5/19. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 10/22/2019, Replies due by 11/5/2019); granting in part #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss Party The State of Oklahoma ex rel The Oklahoma Department of Human Services , #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss Party The State of Oklahoma ex rel The Oklahoma Department of Human Services ) by Dawn Jane Cox (Pence, Elizabeth)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Kathleen Pence on behalf of Dawn Jane Cox [Note: Attorney Elizabeth Kathleen Pence added to party Dawn Jane Cox(pty:pla).] (Pence, Elizabeth)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of State Court Clerk by State of Oklahoma, The (Langford, John)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , vacating/setting aside order(s) (Re: 8 Minute Order,, Directing Attorney to File PHV Motion, ) (Documents Terminated: 8 Minute Order,, Directing Attorney to File PHV Motion, ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (eaw, Dpty Clk)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Gina Ann Cowley to file by 10/01/2019 a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice per Local Civil Rule 83.2. Additionally, if you intend to practice in this district in the future and want to become a member of this district, please submit an application for attorney admission. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (eaw, Dpty Clk) Modified on 9/10/2019 - VACATED per 9 (sac, Dpty Clk).
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in entering the scheduling order. If necessary, a scheduling order will be entered after ruling on the pending motion to dismiss (Dkt. # 6). (Re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss Party The State of Oklahoma ex rel The Oklahoma Department of Human Services , #2 Notice of Removal ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Party The State of Oklahoma ex rel The Oklahoma Department of Human Services by State of Oklahoma, The (With attachments) (Langford, John)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by State of Oklahoma, The (Langford, John)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John K.F. Langford on behalf of State of Oklahoma, The (Langford, John)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by State of Oklahoma, The (Langford, John)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from The District Court of Tulsa County, case number CJ-2019-00335 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2103654) by State of Oklahoma, The (With attachments) (Langford, John)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by State of Oklahoma, The (Langford, John)
January 25, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Dawn Jane Cox (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. State of Oklahoma, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Oklahoma, The
Represented By: John K.F. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tulsa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Remy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aubrie Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Jane Cox
Represented By: Gina Ann Cowley
Represented By: Jenny Proehl-Day
Represented By: Jenny Marie Proehl-Day
Represented By: Elizabeth Kathleen Pence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?