Reeves v. Enterprise Products Partners, LP
Plaintiff: Darrell Reeves and James King
Defendant: Enterprise Products Partners, LP
Case Number: 4:2019cv00570
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Compel (Re: #36 MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) by Darrell Reeves ; (Liles, William)
December 18, 2019 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Stay (Re: #38 MOTION to Stay Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion to Authorize a Collective Action ) by Darrell Reeves ; (Liles, William)
December 10, 2019 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) by Enterprise Products Partners, LP ; (With attachments) (DeMuro, Paul)
December 6, 2019 Filing 40 SUPPLEMENT Authority (Re: #29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration , #35 Response in Opposition to Motion ) by Darrell Reeves (With attachments) (Dunlap, Andrew)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Joint Motion to Extend Joint Status Report Deadline (Doc. 37) is granted. The Joint Status Report shall be filed by February 3, 2020. ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); granting #37 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
November 27, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Stay Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion to Authorize a Collective Action (Re: #32 Opposed MOTION for Collective Action Certification ) by Enterprise Products Partners, LP (DeMuro, Paul)
November 27, 2019 Filing 37 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #26 Order, Directing Parties to File Joint Status Report ) by Enterprise Products Partners, LP (DeMuro, Paul)
November 27, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Enterprise Products Partners, LP (With attachments) (DeMuro, Paul)
November 26, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) by Darrell Reeves ; (Dunlap, Andrew)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Motion for Admission of Kyla J. Miller Pro Hac Vice (Doc. 33) is granted. Ms. Miller may appear in this matter on behalf of the Defendant. ; granting #33 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
November 20, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kyla J. Miller to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2138770) by Enterprise Products Partners, LP (With attachments) (DeMuro, Paul)
November 15, 2019 Filing 32 Opposed MOTION for Collective Action Certification by James King, Darrell Reeves [Note: Attorney Andrew Wells Dunlap added to party James King(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Dunlap, Andrew)
November 5, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Darrell Reeves (With attachments) (Burrage, Michael)
November 5, 2019 Filing 30 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Burrage on behalf of Darrell Reeves [Note: Attorney Michael Burrage added to party Darrell Reeves(pty:pla).] (Burrage, Michael)
November 5, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Enterprise Products Partners, LP (With attachments) (DeMuro, Paul)
November 5, 2019 Filing 28 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Paul DeMuro on behalf of Enterprise Products Partners, LP [Note: Attorney Paul DeMuro added to party Enterprise Products Partners, LP(pty:dft).] (DeMuro, Paul)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell All deadlines and hearings previously set by the transferring court are stricken. The Court will enter a new Scheduling Order after the parties file their Joint Status Report. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 11/29/2019) (SAS, Chambers)
October 25, 2019 Filing 25 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Rachel Cowen (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 25, 2019 Filing 24 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Joseph Y Ahmad, Jordan Lyn Warshauer and Neal Avishek Sarkar (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 25, 2019 Filing 23 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Richard J Burch (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 25, 2019 Filing 22 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Andrew Wells Dunlap, William Richard Liles and Michael A Josephson (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 25, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , changing case number to 19-cv-570-JED-FHM (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 25, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Enterprise Products Partners, LP to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 25, 2019 Filing 19 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Texas Southern
October 23, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Oklahoma. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 10/23/2019, filed. (jguajardo, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/25/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Northern District of Oklahoma (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/25/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 17 Agreed MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Oklahoma by Enterprise Gathering, LLC, Enterprise Products Partners, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Warshauer, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/25/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Warshauer on behalf of Enterprise Products Partners, LP, filed. (Warshauer, Jordan) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/25/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Rachel Cowen to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Enterprise Products Partners, LP. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/25/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Rachel Cowen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Enterprise Products Partners, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Supplement Oath)(Ahmad, Joseph) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/25/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal A. Sarkar on behalf of Enterprise Products Partners, LP, filed. (Sarkar, Neal) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/25/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Y. Ahmad on behalf of Enterprise Products Partners, LP, filed. (Ahmad, Joseph) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/25/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Enterprise Products Partners, LP, filed.(Ahmad, Joseph) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/25/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Enterprise Products Partners, LP, filed.(Ahmad, Joseph) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/25/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Darrell Reeves, filed.(Dunlap, Andrew) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/25/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Enterprise Products Partners, LP served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019, filed.(Liles, William) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/25/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. (Rex) Burch on behalf of Darrell Reeves, filed. (Burch, Richard) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/25/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Liles on behalf of Darrell Reeves, filed. (Liles, William) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/25/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Darrell Reeves, filed. (Dunlap, Andrew) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/25/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Enterprise Products Partners, LP. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(SarahShelby, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/25/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 09:30 PM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/25/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Enterprise Products Partners, LP, filed.(Josephson, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/25/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Enterprise Products Partners, LP (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22822578) filed by Darrell Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Consent)(Josephson, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/25/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reeves v. Enterprise Products Partners, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Reeves
Represented By: Richard J Burch
Represented By: Andrew Wells Dunlap
Represented By: William Richard Liles
Represented By: Michael A Josephson
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James King
Represented By: Andrew Wells Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Products Partners, LP
Represented By: Jordan Lyn Warshauer
Represented By: Joseph Y Ahmad
Represented By: Neal Avishek Sarkar
Represented By: Rachel Cowen
Represented By: Rachel Beth Cowen
Represented By: Paul DeMuro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?