City of Tulsa v. Cephalon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: City of Tulsa
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Anda, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, TEVA Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Actavis PLC, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Keysource Medical, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Morris & Dickson Co, LLC, McKesson Corp., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Watson Pharma, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, GCP Pharma, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp. and Physicians Total Care, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00493
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #44 MOTION to Remand ) by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. ; (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 20, 2020 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #43 MOTION to Expedite Ruling ) by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. ; (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 17, 2020 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #44 MOTION to Remand ) by McKesson Corp. ; (With attachments) (Campbell, Stuart)
November 6, 2020 Filing 46 Joint RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #43 MOTION to Expedite Ruling ) by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, McKesson Corp. ; (Campbell, Stuart)
November 6, 2020 Filing 45 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, McKesson Corp. (With attachments) (Campbell, Stuart)
October 30, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION to Remand by City of Tulsa (With attachments) (Court, Todd)
October 30, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION to Expedite Ruling by City of Tulsa (Court, Todd)
October 20, 2020 Filing 42 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mallinckrodt PLC (Epstein, Jonathan)
October 20, 2020 Filing 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt PLC for Mallinckrodt LLC) by Mallinckrodt LLC (Epstein, Jonathan)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - The motion #39 is granted. Defendant Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. shall refer to the Court's ruling at 19 for specifics. ; granting #39 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: 19 Minute Order,,,,,, Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,, #39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
October 16, 2020 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Riddles, D)
October 16, 2020 Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Riddles, D)
October 16, 2020 Filing 37 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. [Note: Attorney D Todd Riddles added to party Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Riddles, D)
October 15, 2020 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CVS Health Corporation (White, Amy)
October 15, 2020 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Pharmacy, Inc.) by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (White, Amy)
October 15, 2020 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc. for Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC) by Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC (White, Amy)
October 14, 2020 Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Mallinckrodt PLC and Mallinckrodt LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
October 12, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Filing Bankruptcy by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC (Epstein, Jonathan)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that the motion #30 is granted. Defendants McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., The Harvard Drug Group, LLC, and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation shall refer to the Court's ruling at 19 for specifics. ; granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #30 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12, 19 Minute Order,,,,,, Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,, ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
October 9, 2020 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
October 9, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: incorrect spelling of party names; Correction: corrected the spelling of party names (Re: 29 Minute Order,,,, Directing Party(ies) to File Corporate Disclosure Statement,,, ) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
October 9, 2020 Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Anda, Inc.; CVS Health Corporation; CVS Pharmacy, Inc.; and Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk) Modified on 10/9/2020 to correct the spelling of party names (dlg, Dpty Clk).
October 8, 2020 Filing 28 SUPPLEMENT (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by McKesson Corp. (With attachments) (Campbell, Stuart)
October 8, 2020 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
October 8, 2020 Filing 26 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stuart Douglas Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that the motion #24 is granted. Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C., and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., a/k/a Walgreen Co. shall refer to the Court ruling at 19 for specifics. ; granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: 19 Minute Order,,,,,, Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,, State Court Petition/Complaint, #24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
October 7, 2020 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. [Note: Attorney Amy Durrell White added to party CVS Health Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Durrell White added to party CVS Pharmacy, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Durrell White added to party Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC(pty:dft).] (White, Amy)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that the motion #22 is granted. Defendants Anda, Inc. and Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. shall refer to the Court ruling at 19 for specifics. ; granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: 19 Minute Order,,,,,, Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,, #22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
October 7, 2020 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (Evans, Kyle)
October 7, 2020 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent TEVA Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD for Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc.) by Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (Evans, Kyle)
October 7, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kyle David Evans on behalf of Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. [Note: Attorney Kyle David Evans added to party Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle David Evans added to party Anda, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Evans, Kyle)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that the motion #18 is granted. Moving defendants' responsive pleadings to petition due 45 days after the later of: JPML decision to vacate conditional transfer order covering this action or final denial of transfer; or (2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand. ; granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, #18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (to File Responsive Pleadings) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
October 6, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (to File Responsive Pleadings) (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
October 5, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (McKee, Caleb)
October 5, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Cardinal Health, Inc., Corporate Parent Generic Drug Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent HDG Acquisition, Inc., Corporate Parent Cardinal Health 110, LLC for Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The) by Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The (Ray, Ryan)
October 5, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
October 5, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The (Ray, Ryan)
October 5, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp. (McBride, D)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp.) by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp. (Huntsman, Susan)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp. (Huntsman, Susan)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Donna Welch (jjs, Dpty Clk)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., McKesson Corp., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, Cardinal Health, Inc.,Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.,Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , : Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, the removing party(ies) shall file a Status Report on Removed Action within five (5) days of the filing of the notice of removal in the U.S. District Court. The form is available on the Court's website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.) by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc.) by Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Raymond Edward Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from District Court of Tulsa County, case number CJ-2020-02705 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2276492) by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (With attachments) (Zschiesche, Raymond)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
September 2, 2020 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by City of Tulsa (jjs, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Tulsa v. Cephalon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Ernest Holden
Represented By: Caleb Shane McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: John Hunt Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle David Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Alan Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle David Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By: Jonathan Alan Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle David Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Raymond Edward Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Kyle David Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: D Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle David Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle David Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Steven Ernest Holden
Represented By: Caleb Shane McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle David Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Raymond Edward Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: John Hunt Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Donna Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp.
Represented By: Kaylee Patricia Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart Douglas Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John Hunt Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Amy Durrell White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Amy Durrell White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John Hunt Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Durrell White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp.
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Tulsa
Represented By: Todd A Court
Represented By: Tony G Puckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?