Parks v. AT&T Mobility LLC et al

Plaintiff: Billie Parks
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC and Radio Shack Corporation
Case Number: 5:2009cv00212
Filed: February 24, 2009
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending Office
County: Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D. DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2013 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 152 Motion for Reconsideration Order Granting Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/11/2013. (mb)
September 25, 2012 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 103 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 104 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/25/2012. (mb)
January 12, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 51 Motion to Dismiss; denying 52 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/12/2011. (mb, )
March 4, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion to Dismiss; granting 29 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint within 20 days. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/4/2010. (mb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parks v. AT&T Mobility LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billie Parks
Represented By: David L Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radio Shack Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?