United States of America v. Southeastern Oklahoma State University et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Southeastern Oklahoma State University and Regional University System of Oklahoma
Intervenor_plaintiff: Rachel Tudor
Case Number: 5:2015cv00324
Filed: March 30, 2015
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J. Cauthron
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2018 292 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 06/06/18. (wh)
April 13, 2018 286 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 279 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for Order Reconsideration of Reinstatement or, Alternatively, Front Pay; and striking as moot Plaintiff's 280 FIRST MOTION to Supplement Motion for Reconsideration of Reinstatement or, in the Alternative, Front Pay, 281 SECOND MOTION to Supplement Motion for Reconsideration of Reinstatement or, in the Alternative, Front Pay, and 282 AMENDED MOTION to Supplement SECOND MOTION to Supplement Motion for Reconsideration of Reinstatement or, in the Alternative, Front Pay. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 04/13/18. (wh)
October 26, 2017 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 177 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 10/26/17. (lg)
October 17, 2017 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER stricken as moot 146 United States' Motion to Compel Production of ESI Withheld on the Basis of Privilege ; stricken as moot 149 Defendants Southeastern Oklahoma State University and the Regional University System of Oklahoma's Mo tion to Partially Quash Plaintiff's Second Amended Notice of Oral Deposition Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) ; denying 156 Defendants Southeastern Oklahoma State University and the Regional University System of Oklahomas Motion for Entry of Protective Order; granting in part 164 Stipulation and Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff United States' Complaint with Prejudice. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 10/17/17. (lg)
September 6, 2017 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 98 Defendants' Second Motion in Limine. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 9/6/17. (lg)
August 10, 2016 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 67 Defendant Regional University System of Oklahoma's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 8/10/16. (lg)
July 10, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking 27 Defendants Southeastern Oklahoma State University and The Regional University System of Oklahomas Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff/Intervenors Complaint in Part ; denying 30 Defendants Southeastern Oklahoma State University and The Regional University System of Oklahomas Amended Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff/Intervenors Complaint in Part. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 7/10/15. (lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Southeastern Oklahoma State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Meredith L Burrell
Represented By: Delora L Kennebrew
Represented By: Allan K Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeastern Oklahoma State University
Represented By: Dixie L Coffey
Represented By: Kindanne C Jones
Represented By: Jeb E Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional University System of Oklahoma
Represented By: Dixie L Coffey
Represented By: Kindanne C Jones
Represented By: Jeb E Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Rachel Tudor
Represented By: Brittany M Novotny
Represented By: Jillian T Weiss
Represented By: Ezra I Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?