Pilson v. Grand Casino et al

Plaintiff: Donald Pilson
Defendant: Richard Smotherman, Grand Casino, John Canavan, Eric Reed and Adam Panter
Case Number: 5:2019cv00038
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Referring Judge: Gary M Purcell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell no longer assigned to case. (cps)
March 11, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION : It is recommended Plaintiff's action be dismissed without prejudice to refiling. Objections to R&R due by 4/1/2019. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge in the captioned matter, and any pending motionnot specifically addressed herein is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 3/11/2019. (cps)
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Canavan, Grand Casino, Adam Panter, Richard Smotherman filed by Donald Pilson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Habeas Corpus 2241 Petition, #2 Envelope)(nv)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Plaintiff may file his amended pleading no later than March 6, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 2/20/2019. (cps)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO AGENCY HAVING CUSTODY OF PLAINTIFF FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE. Please see Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 2/20/2019. (cps)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 Receipt for Money Received from Donald Pilson in the amount of $23.31, receipt number OKW500072375 regarding #1 Complaint. Balance remaining is $326.69. Receipt mailed to payor. (nv)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.Court finds Plaintiff is entitled to proceed without full prepayment of the filing fee, and his motion is granted. However, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff shall be required to pay the full $350 filing fee as set forth hereafter. Please see Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 2/1/2019. (cps)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald Pilson. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Inmate Account Summary, #2 Envelope)(nv)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCY. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall cure the deficiency designated above by the 5th day of February, 2019. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail to the Plaintiffs along with this Order copies of the court-approved in forma pauperis form. Otherwise, the Court will recommend dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 1/18/2019. (cps)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 Enter ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. Entered at the direction of Honorable Joe Heaton on 01/15/19. (nv)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 NO PREVIOUS Cases. (nv)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Eastern; Case Number 6:19-cv-00009.
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White transferring case to the Western District of Oklahoma. (tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/15/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Donald Pilson. Responses due by 1/24/2019 (pjw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/15/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Canavan, Grand Casino, Adam Panter, Eric Reed, Richard Smotherman by Donald Pilson (pjw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pilson v. Grand Casino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Pilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Smotherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Casino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Canavan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Panter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?