Garcia et al v. Whitaker et al

Defendant: Kirstjen M Nielsen, L Francis Cissna, FNU LNU, Brian Lutz, Mike Pompeo and Matt Whitaker
Petitioner: Jesus Corona Garcia and Jannet Gomez
Case Number: 5:2019cv00166
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jesus Corona Garcia. (Cannon, Lizz)
April 8, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jesus Corona Garcia. Mike Pompeo served on 4/4/2019. (Cannon, Lizz)
April 8, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jesus Corona Garcia. L Francis Cissna served on 4/4/2019. (Cannon, Lizz)
April 8, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jesus Corona Garcia. Brian Lutz served on 4/4/2019. (Cannon, Lizz)
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jesus Corona Garcia. Kirstjen M Nielsen served on 4/4/2019. (Cannon, Lizz)
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jesus Corona Garcia. Matt Whitaker served on 4/4/2019. (Cannon, Lizz)
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FNU LNU. FNU LNU served on 4/4/2019. (Cannon, Lizz)
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued Electronically as to Mike Pompeo, Matt Whitaker. (kmt)
March 22, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to FNU LNU, Brian Lutz, Kirstjen M Nielsen, Mike Pompeo. (kmt)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lizz Cannon. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/21/2019. (mb)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs.(Edstrom, Michelle)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Add Party Lizz (Elizabeth) Cannon by All Plaintiffs. (Edstrom, Michelle)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Michelle L Edstrom on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Edstrom, Michelle) Modified on 3/19/2019 (kmt).
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER striking #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lizz Cannon. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/5/2019. (mb)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 Receipt for Money Received from Jesus Corona Garcia, Jannet Gomez in the amount of $50.00, receipt number OKW500072597 regarding #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lizz Cannon (kmt)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lizz Cannon by All Plaintiffs. (Edstrom, Michelle)
February 22, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2869053. (Edstrom, Michelle)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jesus Corona Garcia, Jannet Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia et al v. Whitaker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Pompeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jesus Corona Garcia
Represented By: Lizz Cannon
Represented By: Michelle L Edstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jannet Gomez
Represented By: Lizz Cannon
Represented By: Michelle L Edstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?