Wilson v. Lowe's Home Centers LLC

Plaintiff: Roy J Wilson
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers LLC and Lowe
Case Number: 5:2019cv00547
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due 8/31/2019; Motions to amend due 8/31/2019; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 12/2/2019; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 12/16/2019; Pla witness list due 12/2/2019; Dft witness list due 12/16/2019; Pla exhibit list due 12/20/2019; Dft exhibit list due 1/3/2020; Motions in limine due 2/3/2020; Jury instructions due 2/3/2020; Voir dire requests due 2/3/2020; Trial briefs due 2/3/2020; Discovery due by 2/3/2020. Jury Trial set for 3/10/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom 304 before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Motions due by 1/2/2020. Pretrial Report due by 2/3/2020. Executed at the direction of the Honorable Scott L. Palk on 8/1/2019. (md)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Roy J Wilson. (Wicker, Brad)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Brad W Wicker on behalf of Roy J Wilson (Wicker, Brad)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by J Derek Ingle on behalf of Roy J Wilson (Ingle, J)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 8/1/2019 11:00 AM in Chambers before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 7/25/2019. (md)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew M Gunn on behalf of All Defendants (Gunn, Andrew)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeremy K Schrag on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers LLC (Schrag, Jeremy)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Lowe's Home Centers LLC . (Schrag, Jeremy)
June 17, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2942539. (Schrag, Jeremy)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Kay County, case number CJ-2018-221 filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Petition, #3 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit Answer, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Represented By: Jeremy K Schrag
Represented By: Andrew M Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe
Represented By: Jeremy K Schrag
Represented By: Andrew M Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy J Wilson
Represented By: Brad W Wicker
Represented By: J Derek Ingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?