Teague v. Crow et al
Petitioner: Herman Teague
Respondent: Director DOC Scott Crow, Jimmy Martin, Mike Hunter and Corrections Corporation of America
Case Number: 5:2020cv00441
Filed: May 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Referring Judge: Suzanne Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Corrections Corporation of America . (Moore, Darrell)
May 13, 2020 Filing 16 ENTERED ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 5/13/2020. (rb)
May 13, 2020 Filing 15 NO PREVIOUS Cases (rb)
May 13, 2020 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Northern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00170.
May 12, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated (Documents Terminated: #10 MOTION to Dismiss Party Corrections Corporation of America and Brief in Support ) (see document number #13 ) (sac, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 5/13/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell transferring case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma for all further proceedings., transferring case (terminates case) (Re: #1 Complaint ) (SAS, Chambers) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 5/13/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Corrections Corporation of America to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 5/13/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Scott Crow, Mike Hunter, Jimmy Martin (With attachments) (Hawkins, Kari) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 5/13/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Party Corrections Corporation of America and Brief in Support by Corrections Corporation of America (With attachments) (Moore, Darrell) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 5/13/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Darrell Lee Moore on behalf of Corrections Corporation of America [Note: Attorney Darrell Lee Moore added to party Corrections Corporation of America(pty:dft).] (Moore, Darrell) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 5/13/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jacqueline R Zamarripa on behalf of Scott Crow, Mike Hunter, Jimmy Martin [Note: Attorney Jacqueline R Zamarripa added to party Scott Crow(pty:dft), Attorney Jacqueline R Zamarripa added to party Mike Hunter(pty:dft), Attorney Jacqueline R Zamarripa added to party Jimmy Martin(pty:dft).] (Zamarripa, Jacqueline) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 5/13/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kari Yvonne Hawkins on behalf of Scott Crow, Mike Hunter, Jimmy Martin [Note: Attorney Kari Yvonne Hawkins added to party Scott Crow(pty:dft), Attorney Kari Yvonne Hawkins added to party Mike Hunter(pty:dft), Attorney Kari Yvonne Hawkins added to party Jimmy Martin(pty:dft).] (Hawkins, Kari) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 5/13/2020.]
April 30, 2020 ***Remark: Emailed docket numbers 1 and 6 to the Office of the Attorney General at fhc.docket@oag.ok.gov (Re: #1 Complaint, #6 Order,,, Directing Respondent to Show Cause re: PWHC,,,,, ) (alg, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 5/13/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Clerk of Court shall send, electronically, the petition (Doc. 1), and this order to the Office of the Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma at fhc.docket@oag.ok.gov, Attn: Mike Hunter. The Attorney General shall file a response on or before May 4, 2020. Plaintiff may file a reply on or before May 6, 2020., directing Respondent to show cause why the writ should not issue and file a response to the petition( Responses due by 5/4/2020, Replies due by 5/6/2020) (Re: #1 Complaint ) (SAS, Chambers) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 5/13/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Herman Teague (Kaufman, Ronald) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 5/13/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk randomly, reassigning case to Chief Judge John E Dowdell, due to a conflict, Judge Gregory K Frizzell no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 20-cv-0170-JED-JFJ (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 5/13/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 APPENDIX of Authorities by Herman Teague (With attachments) (Kaufman, Ronald) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 5/13/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ronald Christopher Kaufman on behalf of Herman Teague (Kaufman, Ronald) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 5/13/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2200073) by Herman Teague (With attachments) (Kaufman, Ronald) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 5/13/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teague v. Crow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director DOC Scott Crow
Represented By: Jacqueline R Zamarripa
Represented By: Kari Y Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jimmy Martin
Represented By: Jacqueline R Zamarripa
Represented By: Kari Y Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Hunter
Represented By: Jacqueline R Zamarripa
Represented By: Kari Y Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Corrections Corporation of America
Represented By: Darrell L Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Herman Teague
Represented By: Ronald Christopher Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?