Jackson v. Martin
Defendant: Jimmy Martin
Petitioner: Joseph M Jackson
Case Number: 5:2020cv00826
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Referring Judge: Shon T Erwin
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #7 filed by Joseph M Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Westlaw Printout, #2 Exhibit D - Letter to Pardon and Parole Board re July 2020 Parole Docket, #3 Exhibit E - Notice of Pardon and Parole Board Hearing Results, #4 Exhibit F - LARC Case Plan, #5 Exhibit G - Westlaw Printout re Consideration for parole, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Joseph M Jackson, #7 Exhibit Westlaw Printout re Repreives, commutations, paroles and pardons, #8 Attachment Letter and Amended Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 USC 2241)(em)
September 18, 2020 Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin no longer assigned to case. (mc)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- it is recommended that the Petition ECF No. #1 be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which habeas relief could be granted. This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral by the District Judge in this matter. Objections to R&R due by 10/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 9/18/2020. (mc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Receipt for Money Received from Joseph M Jackson in the amount of $5.00, receipt number OKW500081548 regarding #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, mailed to Joseph M Jackson #113907 SAYRE-NFCC FN117 1605 E Main Sayre, OK 73662 (kah)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 8/17/2020. (rb)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Robin J. Cauthron for all further proceedings. Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti no longer assigned to case.Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/17/2020. (rb)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 PREVIOUS Cases (rb)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION by Joseph M Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rb)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joseph M Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1- Westlaw information, #2 Attachment 2- Letter, #3 Attachment 3- Notice of Pardon and Parole Board Hearing results, #4 Attachment 4- LARC Case Plan, #5 Attachment 5- Cover Letter, #6 Envelope)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph M Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?