Peters v. Sam's East Inc et al
Plaintiff: Beverly Peters
Defendant: Sam's East Inc and Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Case Number: 5:2020cv00920
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi W Dishman
Referring Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Counsel for Plaintiff John D. Coury is directed to show cause by 11/9/2020 why he should not be terminated from this case for failure to file his Enter of Appearance as is required by LCvR 83.4. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 11/3/2020. (md)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due 11/25/2020; Motions to amend due 11/25/2020; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 6/1/2021; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 6/15/2021; Pla witness list due 6/1/2021; Dft witness list due 6/15/2021; Pla exhibit list due 6/21/2021; Dft exhibit list due 6/28/2021; Stipulations due 8/2/2021; Motions in limine due 8/2/2021; Jury instructions due 8/2/2021; Voir dire requests due 8/2/2021; Trial briefs due 8/2/2021; Discovery due by 8/2/2021. Jury Trial set for 9/14/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom 304 before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Motions due by 6/1/2021. Pretrial Report due by 8/2/2021. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 10/26/20. (md)
October 22, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Defendants Sam's East Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Brewer, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 Exhibit List / Witness List Rule 26 Disclosures by Plaintiff Beverly Peters. (Haiges, Robert)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2020 10:15 AM before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 10/22/2020. (md)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Scott L. Palk for all further proceedings. Honorable Jodi W. Dishman no longer assigned to case. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 09/18/2020. (nv)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert W Haiges on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Haiges, Robert)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey D Scott on behalf of All Defendants (Scott, Jeffrey)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by All Defendants . (Brewer, Michael)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Defendants. (Brewer, Michael)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Brewer on behalf of All Defendants (Brewer, Michael)
September 11, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3276166. (Brewer, Michael)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-1053 filed by Sam's East Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copy of the Oklahoma County District Court Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Petition, #5 Exhibit 5 - Entry of Appearance by Michael Brewer, #6 Exhibit 6 - Entry of Appearance by Jeffrey Scott, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(em)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peters v. Sam's East Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's East Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey D Scott
Represented By: Michael W Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Represented By: Jeffrey D Scott
Represented By: Michael W Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Peters
Represented By: John D Coury
Represented By: Robert W Haiges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?