Johnston v. Wray
Plaintiff: Andrew Johnston
Defendant: Christopher Wray
Case Number: 5:2020cv01061
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Shon T Erwin
Referring Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Docket Annotation: DETAILS: Case transferred from Oklahoma Western has been opened in DISTRICT OF ARIZONA as case 4:20-cv-00520, filed 11/24/2020. (kmt)
November 24, 2020 Docket Annotation: Case has been sent to the District of Arizona at InterdistrictTransfer_AZD@azd.uscourts.gov. (kmt)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for #5 Report and Recommendation, This matter is Transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Arizona. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 11/24/20. (jw)
October 23, 2020 Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin no longer assigned to case. (mc)
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- the undersigned recommends TRANSFER of this matter, including Plaintiff's pending Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. 2) to the United States District Court for the District of Arizona.This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral. Objections to R&R due by 11/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 10/23/2020. (mc)
October 21, 2020 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. Signed by the direction of Honorable David L. Russell on 10/21/20. (kmt)
October 21, 2020 Filing 3 PREVIOUS Cases (kmt)
October 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andrew Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
October 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christopher Wray filed by Andrew Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnston v. Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?