Rigsby v. Marler et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Ray Rigsby, Jr
Defendant: Doctor FNU Marler, Oklahoma State of, FNU LNU, Dr Marlar and Doctor FNU Pain
Case Number: 5:2021cv00316
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Referring Judge: Amanda Maxfield Green
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER from Dennis Ray Rigsby Jr (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kah)
April 22, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER from Dennis Ray Rigsby Jr (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kah)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of twenty percent (20%) of the preceding month's income credited to his prison account(s) until he has paid the total filing fee of $350.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 4/16/2021. (rb)
April 12, 2021 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. Motions referred to Amanda Maxfield Green.Signed by the direction of Honorable Charles Goodwin on 4/12/2021. (kah)
April 8, 2021 Filing 3 NO PREVIOUS Cases (kah)
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dennis Ray Rigsby, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Financial Statements, #2 Envelope)(kah)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FNU LNU(in official capacity, Doctors at Oklahoma State Prison), FNU LNU(individual capacity, Doctors at Oklahoma State Prison), FNU Marler(in official capacity), FNU Marler(individual capacity), Oklahoma State of(individual capacity), Oklahoma State of(official capacity), FNU Pain(in official capacity, of Corrections Corp. of America at C.C.F. in Cushing OK), FNU Pain(individual capacity, of Corrections Corp. of America at C.C.F. in Cushing OK) filed by Dennis Ray Rigsby, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rigsby v. Marler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor FNU Marler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Marlar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor FNU Pain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Ray Rigsby, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?