Rigsby v. Chicago City of et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Ray Rigsby, Jr
Defendant: Chicago City of, Illinois State of and FNU LNU
Case Number: 5:2021cv00666
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Referring Judge: Gary M Purcell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 12 LETTER from Dennis Rigsby Jr (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jjs)
August 2, 2021 Filing 11 OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #10 filed by Dennis Ray Rigsby, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjs)
July 23, 2021 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - It is recommended Plaintiffs claims Doc #1 re Complaint be dismissed without prejudice as untimely. Additionally, to the extent Plaintiff seeks monetary damages against Defendant State of Illinois, said claims should be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 8/12/2021. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge in the captioned matter, and any pending motion not specifically addressed herein is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 7/23/2021. (cps)
July 23, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell no longer assigned to case. (cps)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. However, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff shall be required to pay the full $350 filing fee as set forth in this Order. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 7/2/2021. (cps)
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER from Dennis Rigsby Jr (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jjs)
June 30, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER from Dennis Rigsby Jr (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jjs)
June 30, 2021 Filing 6 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. Signed by the direction of Honorable Charles Goodwin on 6/30/2021. (kmt)
June 30, 2021 Filing 5 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Charles Goodwin for all further proceedings. Honorable Robin J. Cauthron no longer assigned to case. Signed by the direction of Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 6/30/2021. (kmt)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 PREVIOUS Cases (kmt)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE titled, "Add on for page 6 of 8" by Dennis Ray Rigsby, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dennis Ray Rigsby, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chicago City of(of the Great State of Illinois; in the official capacity), Chicago City of(in the individual capacity), Illinois State of(in the individual capacity), Illinois State of(Great; in the official capacity), FNU LNU(in the individual capacity), FNU LNU(in official capacity; Any other State or City doing reparations for slave descendants) filed by Dennis Ray Rigsby, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rigsby v. Chicago City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Ray Rigsby, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?