Anderlohr v. Turn Key Health
Plaintiff: Jimmy Anderlohr
Defendant: Turn Key Health, Javier Martinez, Kasey LNU and Stephens County Jail
Case Number: 5:2021cv00776
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Shon T Erwin
Referring Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- it is recommended that the Court should: (1) dismiss, with prejudice, any claim against the Stephens County Jail; (2) dismiss, without prejudice, the official capacity claims against Defendant Martinez; (3) dismiss, without prejudice, any claim against Defendant Kasey; (4) dismiss, without prejudice, any claim against Turn-Key Health; and (5) conclude that Plaintiff has stated an individual capacity claim for deliberate indifference under the Fourteenth Amendment against Defendant Martinez limited to the recovery of monetary damages.This Report and Recommendation does not terminate the referral by the assigned District Judge. Objections to R&R due by 10/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 9/28/2021. (mc)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO AGENCY HAVING CUSTODY OF PLAINTIFF FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE. See Order as more fully set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 9/28/2021. (mc)
September 8, 2021 Filing 6 Receipt for Money Received from Jimmy Anderlohr in the amount of $24.00, receipt number OKW500087109 regarding #1 Complaint. Remaining balance $326.00. Receipt mailed to: Jimmy AnderlohrDUNCAN-SCJ101 S 11th StDuncan, OK 73533 (kmt)
September 7, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER from Jimmy Anderlohr (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (dtb)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. However, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff shall be required to pay the full $350.00 filing fee as set forth hereafter.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before September 6, 2021, Plaintiff pay an initial partial filing fee of $24.00. See Order as more fully set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 8/19/2021. (mc)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin.. Signed at the direction of The Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 8/10/2021. (dtb)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 NO PREVIOUS Cases (dtb)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jimmy Anderlohr. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1- Resident Transaction Details, #2 Envelope)(dtb)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Turn Key Health filed by Jimmy Anderlohr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderlohr v. Turn Key Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Anderlohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turn Key Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kasey LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephens County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?