iBall Instruments LLC v. Butler et al
Plaintiff: iBall Instruments LLC
Defendant: Myron Butler, Mark Robert Davis, David E Moore, TOC Solutions Inc, Telecomm Consultants Inc and TOC Rural Solutions LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00778
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi W Dishman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Plaintiff iBall Instruments, LLC's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Amended Complaint. For good cause shown and under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b) and LCvR7.1(h), the Court GRANTS the Motion and extends the deadline for Plaintiff to file its amended complaint to October 13, 2021. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 10/04/2021. (knt)
October 1, 2021 Filing 18 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint by iBall Instruments LLC. (Gordon, Breanne)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. Without expressing any view on the merits of #16 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, the Court reminds Plaintiff of its opportunity to cure any purported pleading defects by filing an amended complaint in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B). If Plaintiff timely files an amended complaint, the Court will deny the Motion as moot. If Plaintiff does not timely file an amended complaint, Plaintiff may file a response to the Motion, and the Court will decide the Motion. Prior to filing either a response to the Motion or an amended complaint, the Court ORDERS counsel for Plaintiff to confer in good faith with counsel for the Defendants regarding the issues raised in the Motion. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 09/21/2021. (knt)
September 13, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss and Opening Brief in Support by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - First Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Second Amended Petition)(Blackburn, Mitchell)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. Before the Court is #14 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. For good cause shown and under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b) and LCvR7.1(h), the Court GRANTS the Motion and extends the deadlines for Defendant to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to September 13, 2021. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 09/01/2021. (knt)
August 31, 2021 Filing 14 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by All Defendants. (Blackburn, Mitchell)
August 31, 2021 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by TOC Rural Solutions LLC . (Blackburn, Mitchell)
August 31, 2021 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Telecomm Consultants Inc . (Blackburn, Mitchell)
August 31, 2021 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by TOC Solutions Inc . (Blackburn, Mitchell)
August 31, 2021 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew D Craig on behalf of All Defendants (Craig, Matthew)
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Mitchell D Blackburn on behalf of All Defendants (Blackburn, Mitchell)
August 24, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by iBall Instruments LLC. Myron Butler served on 8/16/2021. (Gordon, Breanne)
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by iBall Instruments LLC. Mark Robert Davis served on 8/11/2021. (Gordon, Breanne)
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by iBall Instruments LLC. David E Moore served on 8/17/2021. (Gordon, Breanne)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by iBall Instruments LLC As Amended. (Gordon, Breanne)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. The #3 Disclosure Statement - LLC filed by iBall Instruments LLC is STRICKEN and Plaintiff is ORDERED to refile a LCvR7.1.1-compliant disclosure statement within seven days, or by August 26, 2021. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 08/19/2021. (nv)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by iBall Instruments LLC . (Gordon, Breanne)
August 10, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE 5:21-cv-00778 Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BOKWDC-3738033. (Gordon, Breanne)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Myron Butler, Mark Robert Davis, David E Moore, TOC Rural Solutions LLC, TOC Solutions Inc, Telecomm Consultants Inc. (knt)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Myron Butler, Mark Robert Davis, David E Moore, TOC Rural Solutions LLC, TOC Solutions Inc, Telecomm Consultants Inc filed by iBall Instruments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: iBall Instruments LLC v. Butler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: iBall Instruments LLC
Represented By: Breanne M Gordon
Represented By: Joseph M Vorndran
Represented By: Mitchell K McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myron Butler
Represented By: Matthew D Craig
Represented By: Mitchell D Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Robert Davis
Represented By: Matthew D Craig
Represented By: Mitchell D Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David E Moore
Represented By: Matthew D Craig
Represented By: Mitchell D Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOC Solutions Inc
Represented By: Matthew D Craig
Represented By: Mitchell D Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telecomm Consultants Inc
Represented By: Matthew D Craig
Represented By: Mitchell D Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOC Rural Solutions LLC
Represented By: Matthew D Craig
Represented By: Mitchell D Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?