Cole et al v. AMC West Housing LP et al
Plaintiff: Brenan Cole, Rachel Cole, Austin Hodge and Hannah Hodge
Defendant: AMC Military Housing, Balfour Beatty Communities, Steammart LLC, Gregg Peterson Construction Group LLC, AMC West Housing LP, Rick Cunefare and FNU LNU
Case Number: 5:2022cv00044
Filed: January 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2022 Filing 30 Summons Issued Electronically as to Rick Cunefare. (kmt)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying #22 Motion for Disclosure, as more fully set out. Signed by Judge David L. Russell on 3/10/22. (jw)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying #15 Motion to Dismiss. Because the facts upon which Plaintiffs rely in their Amended Petition are the same as those in the 2019 Petition, under Oklahomas transactional approach, the new claims are subject to the savings statute and not barred by the statute of limitations. Therefore, the Motion to Dismiss is DENIED, as more fully set out. Signed by Judge David L. Russell on 3/9/22. (jw)
February 28, 2022 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION for Disclosure of Pre-26(f) Disclosure filed by AMC West Housing LP, Balfour Beatty Communities. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Matthew McGee)(Willis, W)
February 24, 2022 Filing 26 REPLY by Defendants AMC West Housing LP, Balfour Beatty Communities re #16 Supplement, filed by AMC West Housing LP, Balfour Beatty Communities. (Pearson, Carli)
February 17, 2022 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Brenan and Rachel Coles' Amended Petition and Brief in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet and Dismissal)(Salmon, Caleb)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Clarify Style and Party. Signed by Judge David L. Russell on 2/10/22. (jw)
February 10, 2022 Filing 23 JOINT MOTION to Clarify Style and Party by AMC Military Housing, Balfour Beatty Communities. (Willis, W)
February 7, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Disclosure by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cunefare Plea Statement of Facts, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter from BBC to Plaintiff Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Balfour Beatty Communities Plea Agreement)(Salmon, Caleb)
January 31, 2022 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle Nelson on behalf of AMC Military Housing, Balfour Beatty Communities (Nelson, Kyle)
January 31, 2022 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew Beyer on behalf of AMC Military Housing, Balfour Beatty Communities (Beyer, Matthew)
January 31, 2022 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Carli D Pearson on behalf of AMC Military Housing, Balfour Beatty Communities (Pearson, Carli)
January 31, 2022 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Tina Syring-Petrocchi on behalf of AMC Military Housing, Balfour Beatty Communities (Syring-Petrocchi, Tina)
January 27, 2022 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard G Morgan on behalf of AMC Military Housing, Balfour Beatty Communities (Morgan, Richard)
January 27, 2022 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENT re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Brenan and Rachel Coles' Amended Petition and Brief in Support to Provide Inadvertently Omitted Exhibit 1 by AMC Military Housing, Balfour Beatty Communities. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, 05-31-2019)(Willis, W)
January 26, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Brenan and Rachel Coles' Amended Petition and Brief in Support by AMC Military Housing, Balfour Beatty Communities. (Willis, W)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Carli D. Pearson; granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kyle D. Nelson; granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew A. Beyer; granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard G. Morgan; granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tina A. Syring-Petrocchi. Signed by Judge David L. Russell on 1/25/22. (jw)
January 25, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tina A. Syring-Petrocchi Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3838837 by AMC Military Housing, Balfour Beatty Communities. (Willis, W)
January 25, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard G. Morgan Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3838836 by AMC Military Housing, Balfour Beatty Communities. (Willis, W)
January 25, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew A. Beyer Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3838828 by AMC Military Housing, Balfour Beatty Communities. (Willis, W)
January 25, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kyle D. Nelson Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3838818 by AMC Military Housing, Balfour Beatty Communities. (Willis, W)
January 25, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carli D. Pearson Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3838816 by AMC Military Housing, Balfour Beatty Communities. (Willis, W)
January 19, 2022 Receipt for Money Received from AMC Military Housing in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKWDC-3834448 regarding #1 Notice of Removal (Payment made online, system failed to docket notice of receipt) (kmt)
January 18, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, by Balfour Beatty Communities. (Willis, W)
January 18, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Balfour Beatty Communities. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Petition)(Willis, W)
January 18, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE By Court Clerk of Oklahoma County. (Willis, W)
January 18, 2022 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by W Brett Willis on behalf of Balfour Beatty Communities (Willis, W)
January 18, 2022 NOTICE from the Court that #4 MOTION, and #3 MOTION are STRICKEN due to counsel's failure to comply with ECF Policies & Procedures Manual, Section II(A)(4)(a). (kmt)
January 17, 2022 Filing 4 STRICKEN 1/18/2022 (kmt). MOTION for Disclosure of Unindicted Co-conspirator Defendants by Brenan Cole, Rachel Cole, Austin Hodge, Hannah Hodge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Salmon, Caleb)
January 17, 2022 Filing 3 STRICKEN 1/18/2022 (kmt). MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, Original Petition by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Salmon, Caleb)
January 17, 2022 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Caleb M Salmon on behalf of Brenan Cole, Rachel Cole, Austin Hodge, Hannah Hodge (Salmon, Caleb)
January 14, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2021-3723 filed by Balfour Beatty Communities. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #2 Exhibit 2- Notice of Service of Process on BBC, #3 Exhibit 3- Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole et al v. AMC West Housing LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenan Cole
Represented By: Caleb M Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Cole
Represented By: Caleb M Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Hodge
Represented By: Caleb M Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Hodge
Represented By: Caleb M Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMC Military Housing
Represented By: W Brett Willis
Represented By: Carli D Pearson
Represented By: Kyle Nelson
Represented By: Matthew Beyer
Represented By: Richard G Morgan
Represented By: Tina Syring-Petrocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Balfour Beatty Communities
Represented By: W Brett Willis
Represented By: Carli D Pearson
Represented By: Kyle Nelson
Represented By: Matthew Beyer
Represented By: Richard G Morgan
Represented By: Tina Syring-Petrocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steammart LLC
Represented By: W Brett Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Peterson Construction Group LLC
Represented By: W Brett Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMC West Housing LP
Represented By: W Brett Willis
Represented By: Carli D Pearson
Represented By: Kyle Nelson
Represented By: Matthew Beyer
Represented By: Richard G Morgan
Represented By: Tina Syring-Petrocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Cunefare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?