Williams et al v. Clarity Telecom Llc et al
Plaintiff: Jay Williams and Cindy Williams
Defendant: Clarity Telecom Llc doing business as Bluepeak, Quanta Services Management Partnership LP, Mears and Mears Group Inc
Case Number: 5:2022cv00775
Filed: August 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2022 Filing 16 Summons Issued Electronically as to Mears Group Inc. (rr)
October 20, 2022 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mears filed by All Plaintiffs.(Buxton, James)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Substitute Party. Plaintiffs shall file an amended Complaint naming Mears Group, Inc. as the proper Defendant in compliance with Local Civil Rule 15.1, within seven days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 10/14/22. (ms)
October 7, 2022 Filing 13 FIRST MOTION to Substitute Party Defendant by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Buxton, James)
September 26, 2022 NOTICE FROM THE COURT In light of the filing of the #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Quanta Services Management Partnership, L.P. and Clarity Telecom, LLC d/b/a Bluepeak, the #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Quanta Services Management Partnership L.P. is DENIED AS MOOT and Quanta Services Management Partnership, L.P. and Clarity Telecom, LLC are terminated as parties from this matter. (ms)
September 22, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cindy Williams, Jay Williams (Buxton, James)
September 13, 2022 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Quanta Services Management Partnership LP . (Hoffmann, Braden)
September 13, 2022 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Clarity Telecom Llc . (Hoffmann, Braden)
September 13, 2022 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Mears . (Hoffmann, Braden)
September 13, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons and ROS for Def Clarity, #3 Exhibit 3 - Docket Sheet)(Hoffmann, Braden) Modified on 9/14/2022 to correct docket text (rr).
September 9, 2022 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Braden M Hoffmann on behalf of Clarity Telecom Llc, Mears, Quanta Services Management Partnership LP (Hoffmann, Braden)
September 9, 2022 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by James B Buxton, II on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Buxton, James)
September 8, 2022 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Gerald P Green on behalf of Clarity Telecom Llc, Mears, Quanta Services Management Partnership LP (Green, Gerald)
September 7, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Quanta Services Management Partnership LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Susan Hightower)(Hopper, Hailey)
September 7, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Clarity Telecom Llc, Mears.(Hopper, Hailey)
September 7, 2022 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Hailey M Hopper on behalf of All Defendants (Hopper, Hailey)
September 1, 2022 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3983200. (Green, Gerald)
August 31, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Noble County District Court, case number CJ-2022-30 filed by Quanta Services Management Partnership LP, Mears, Clarity Telecom Llc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Williams v Quanta, Mears Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Return of Service - Clarity, #3 Exhibit 3 - OSCN Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(rr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Clarity Telecom Llc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Williams
Represented By: James B Buxton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Williams
Represented By: James B Buxton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarity Telecom Llc doing business as Bluepeak
Represented By: Braden M Hoffmann
Represented By: Gerald P Green
Represented By: Hailey M Hopper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanta Services Management Partnership LP
Represented By: Braden M Hoffmann
Represented By: Gerald P Green
Represented By: Hailey M Hopper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mears
Represented By: Braden M Hoffmann
Represented By: Gerald P Green
Represented By: Hailey M Hopper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mears Group Inc
Represented By: Braden M Hoffmann
Represented By: Gerald P Green
Represented By: Hailey M Hopper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?