Mays v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Otis Mays
Defendant: John Doe, Jane Doe, Warden FNU LNU, FNU LNU, Bureau of Prisons and Federal Transit Center
Case Number: 5:2022cv00824
Filed: September 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Referring Judge: Gary M Purcell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2022 Filing 12 LETTER from Otis Mays (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Notice from the Federal Bureau of Prisons, #2 Envelope) (km)
October 31, 2022 Filing 11 LETTER from Otis Mays (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kmt)
October 24, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time by Otis Mays. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Letter from BoP, #2 Envelope)(kmt)
October 24, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Otis Mays (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
October 17, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Otis Mays (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - It is recommended Plaintiff's action re Doc #1 Complaint bedismissed without prejudice based on his failure to pay the required filing fee and/or comply with the Court's Orders. Objections to R&R due by 11/7/2022. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge in the captioned matter, and any pending motion not specifically addressed herein is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 10/17/2022. (cps)
October 17, 2022 Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell no longer assigned to case. (cps)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. However, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff shall be required to pay the full $350 filing fee as set forth in this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall not issue processuntil further order of the Court, and the Clerk shall send a copy of this Order to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 9/21/2022. (cps)
September 20, 2022 Filing 5 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. Signed by the direction of Judge Charles Goodwin on 09/20/2022. (so)
September 20, 2022 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Charles Goodwin for all further proceedings. Judge Patrick R Wyrick no longer assigned to case. Signed by the direction of Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 09/20/2022. (so)
September 20, 2022 Filing 3 PREVIOUS Cases (so)
September 16, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Otis Mays. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Inmate Account Inquiry, #2 Envelope)(so)
September 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Otis Mays. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Additional Information, #2 Envelope)(so)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mays v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden FNU LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Transit Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?