Integrated Alarm Systems LLC v. Johnson Controls Inc et al
Plaintiff: Integrated Alarm Systems LLC
Defendant: Johnson Controls Inc, Anixter Inc and Tyco Safety Products Canada Inc
Case Number: 5:2023cv00558
Filed: June 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi W Dishman
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 8/24/2023. (nv)
August 24, 2023 Filing 25 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #23 Amended Complaint or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Anixter Inc. (Vincent, Evan)
August 18, 2023 Filing 24 Summons Issued Electronically as to Tyco Safety Products Canada Inc. (ekw)
August 18, 2023 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Anixter Inc filed by All Plaintiffs.(Tawwater, Darren)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Unopposed Motion to Add Party. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file the Amended Complaint within seven days of the date of this Order. The Amended Complaint shall not differ from the one attached to the Motion. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 8/18/2023. (nv)
August 9, 2023 Filing 21 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Add Party by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint)(Tawwater, Darren)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #19 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition and Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 8/9/2023. (nv)
August 8, 2023 Filing 19 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition and Amended Complaint by Anixter Inc. (Vincent, Evan)
August 2, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Tawwater, Darren)
August 2, 2023 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by All Plaintiffs . (Tawwater, Darren)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. This Court ORDERS Plaintiff Integrated Alarm Systems, LLC to file within 7 days of this Order its Corporate Disclosure Statement in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Civil Rule 7.1.1.. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 7/27/2023. (nv)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court extends the deadline for Defendant Anixter, Inc. to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to August 9, 2023. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 7/27/2023. (nv)
July 25, 2023 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Anixter Inc . (Vincent, Evan)
July 25, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition by Anixter Inc. (Vincent, Evan)
July 25, 2023 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Evan G E Vincent on behalf of Anixter Inc (Vincent, Evan)
July 10, 2023 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Larry A Tawwater on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tawwater, Larry)
July 10, 2023 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Plaintiffs. (Tawwater, Darren)
July 10, 2023 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Darren M Tawwater on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tawwater, Darren)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Petition Johnson Controls Inc. The Court extends the deadline for Defendant Johnson Controls, Inc. to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to August 2, 2023. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 6/29/2023. (nv)
June 29, 2023 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Johnson Controls Inc . (Alexander, Robert)
June 28, 2023 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Petition by Johnson Controls Inc. (Alexander, Robert)
June 26, 2023 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert W Ivy on behalf of Johnson Controls Inc (Ivy, Robert)
June 26, 2023 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert H Alexander, Jr on behalf of Johnson Controls Inc (Alexander, Robert)
June 26, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE receipt of Notice of Removal by Oklahoma County Court Clerk. (Alexander, Robert)
June 26, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Johnson Controls Inc re #1 Notice of Removal, (Alexander, Robert)
June 26, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2023-2974 filed by Johnson Controls Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons and Proof of service, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4 - Consent to Removal of Anixter Inc, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(naa)
June 26, 2023 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-4193172. (Alexander, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Integrated Alarm Systems LLC v. Johnson Controls Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Integrated Alarm Systems LLC
Represented By: Bryan A Myers
Represented By: Darren M Tawwater
Represented By: Larry A Tawwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls Inc
Represented By: Robert H Alexander, Jr
Represented By: Robert W Ivy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anixter Inc
Represented By: Evan G E Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Safety Products Canada Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?