Evans et al v. Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
Plaintiff: Deb Evans, Clarence Adams, Richard Brown, Twyla Brown, Craig McLaughlin, Sharon Gow, Niskanen Center, Bill Gow, Stacey McLaughlin, Ron Schaaf and Stephany Adams
Defendant: Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
Case Number: 1:2019cv00766
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RECORD OF ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke: SETTING a telephonic Rule 16 Conference for August 5, 2019 at 10:00 AM. Conference call information will be provided in a separate entry. At the time of the Conference, parties should have their calendars available to discuss scheduling matters, including modification of the current case deadlines, joining additional parties and amending the pleadings, dispositive motions, and setting a trial date. The parties shall consult pursuant to FRCP 26(f) regarding a focused and proportional discovery plan prior to the Conference. Under LR 26.1(b) a written report is not required. However, the parties should be prepared to briefly summarize the issues in the case and give the Court a realistic picture of what discovery needs to be completed. The ultimate goal of the discovery plan shall be "the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination" of the action. FRCP 1. If depositions are anticipated, the parties should confer prior to the Conference and have a firm date for the depositions scheduled prior to the conference. Parties shall confer prior to the Conference and consider whether the case could benefit from a streamlined approach, utilizing limited discovery and early dispositive motions, settlement conference, or an expedited trial date. Finally, if the parties intend to file written consents to a magistrate judge, it would be helpful to do so prior to the Rule 16 Conference, particularly if they want to secure a firm trial date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Answer to #1 Complaint,, . Filed by Federal Energy Regulatory Commission. (Danielson, Kevin)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Federal Energy Regulatory Commission. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Discovery order,, #2 . Dispositive Motions are due by 10/15/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/12/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/15/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 10/15/2019. Dispositive motions are due 10/15/2019 Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5851188 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Craig McLaughlin, Ron Schaaf, Sharon Gow, Stacey McLaughlin, Clarence Adams, Richard Brown, Niskanen Center, Deb Evans, Twila Brown, Bill Gow against Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Attachment). (Moro, Tonia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans et al v. Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deb Evans
Represented By: Tonia L. Moro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Adams
Represented By: Tonia L. Moro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Brown
Represented By: Tonia L. Moro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twyla Brown
Represented By: Tonia L. Moro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig McLaughlin
Represented By: Tonia L. Moro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Gow
Represented By: Tonia L. Moro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niskanen Center
Represented By: Tonia L. Moro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Gow
Represented By: Tonia L. Moro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey McLaughlin
Represented By: Tonia L. Moro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Schaaf
Represented By: Tonia L. Moro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephany Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
Represented By: Kevin C. Danielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?