Klamath-Siskiyou Wildlands Center et al v. United States Bureau of Land Management
Plaintiff: Oregon Wild, Cascadia Wildlands, Klamath-Siskiyou Wildlands Center and Soda Mountain Wilderness Council
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Intervenor Defendant: Murphy Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01810
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 5 U.S.C. ยง 706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Joint Status Report is due by 6/1/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: GRANTING Motion for Stay #16 . The matter is stayed until further order of this Court. The parties are ordered to file a joint status report that includes proposed scheduling deadlines two weeks after BLM releases the final revised North Landscape Project Environmental Assessment or by 06/01/2020, whichever is earlier. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Return of Service Executed Service specifically made upon Regional Counsel or Agency. (Brown, Susan Jane)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Return of Service Executed as to United States Bureau of Land Management served on 12/20/2019, answer due on 2/18/2020. Service specifically made upon Regional Counsel or Agency. (Brown, Susan Jane)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Joint Motion for Stay . Filed by United States Bureau of Land Management. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tustin, John)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Return of Service Executed Service specifically made upon Other Agency. (Brown, Susan Jane)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Return of Service Executed Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney. (Brown, Susan Jane)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Return of Service Executed as to United States Bureau of Land Management served on 11/12/2019, answer due on 1/13/2020. Service specifically made upon U.S. Attorney General. (Brown, Susan Jane)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION AND ORDER: re Unopposed Motion to Intervene and Memorandum in Support of Intervention #5 . The Motion to Intervene #5 is GRANTED. Please access entire text by document number hyperlink. Signed on 12/11/2019 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Notice of Appearance of Emma L. Hamilton appearing on behalf of United States Bureau of Land Management Filed by on behalf of United States Bureau of Land Management. (Hamilton, Emma)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice of Appearance of John P. Tustin appearing on behalf of United States Bureau of Land Management Filed by on behalf of United States Bureau of Land Management. (Tustin, John)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Murphy Company. (Weis, Julie)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Proposed Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Murphy Company. (Weis, Julie)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Declaration of John R. Murphy . Filed by Murphy Company. (Related document(s): Motion to intervene #5 .) (Weis, Julie)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Declaration of Julie Weis (Attaching Exhibits). Filed by Murphy Company. (Related document(s): Motion to intervene #5 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Weis, Julie)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Unopposed Motion to Intervene and Memorandum in Support of Intervention. Filed by Murphy Company. (Weis, Julie)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Bureau of Land Management. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rsm)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Dispositive Motions are due by 4/10/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/11/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/10/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 4/10/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
November 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6077364 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Klamath-Siskiyou Wildlands Center, Oregon Wild, Cascadia Wildlands, Soda Mountain Wilderness Council against United States Bureau of Land Management (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons - BLM). (Brown, Susan Jane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klamath-Siskiyou Wildlands Center et al v. United States Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oregon Wild
Represented By: Sangye Ince-Johannsen
Represented By: Susan Jane McKibben Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cascadia Wildlands
Represented By: Sangye Ince-Johannsen
Represented By: Susan Jane McKibben Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klamath-Siskiyou Wildlands Center
Represented By: Sangye Ince-Johannsen
Represented By: Susan Jane McKibben Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soda Mountain Wilderness Council
Represented By: Sangye Ince-Johannsen
Represented By: Susan Jane McKibben Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Emma L. Hamilton
Represented By: John P. Tustin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Murphy Company
Represented By: Michael E. Haglund
Represented By: Julie A. Weis
Represented By: Christopher T. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?