Cahill Ranches, Inc. v. Bureau of Land Management
Plaintiff: Cahill Ranches, Inc.
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Intervenor Defendant: Oregon Natural Desert Ass'n
Case Number: 1:2021cv01363
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Affidavit of Service #19 . Answer is due by 11/22/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
November 1, 2021 Filing 20 Amended Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint, #1 . Filed by Cahill Ranches, Inc.. (Justesen, Tate)
October 29, 2021 Filing 19 Affidavit of Service upon Bureau of Land Management served on 9/23/2021 Filed by Cahill Ranches, Inc.. (Justesen, Tate)
October 27, 2021 Filing 18 Reply to Motion to Intervene #11 . Filed by Oregon Natural Desert Ass'n. (Lacy, Peter)
October 25, 2021 Filing 17 Response to Motion to Intervene #11 . Filed by Cahill Ranches, Inc.. (Bruner, Aaron)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time #15 is Granted. Plaintiffs deadline to file a response to the Motion to Intervene #11 is extended to 10/25/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
October 18, 2021 Filing 15 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time , Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Intervene #11 . Filed by Cahill Ranches, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Justesen, Tate)
October 4, 2021 Filing 14 Proposed Form of Order Submitted [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Intervene. Filed by Oregon Natural Desert Ass'n. (Lacy, Peter)
October 4, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Oregon Natural Desert Ass'n. (Lacy, Peter)
October 4, 2021 Filing 12 Declaration of Dr. Craig Miller, M.D. . Filed by Oregon Natural Desert Ass'n. (Lacy, Peter)
October 4, 2021 Filing 11 Motion to Intervene . Filed by Oregon Natural Desert Ass'n. (Attachments: #1 Attachment [Proposed] Answer) (Lacy, Peter)
September 21, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bureau of Land Management. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 Amended Proposed Summons (BUSHUE) Filed by Cahill Ranches, Inc.. (Justesen, Tate)
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 Amended Proposed Summons (BLM National Office) Filed by Cahill Ranches, Inc.. (Justesen, Tate)
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 Amended Proposed Summons (US Attorney General) Filed by Cahill Ranches, Inc.. (Justesen, Tate)
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 Amended Proposed Summons (US Attorney Oregon) Filed by Cahill Ranches, Inc.. (Justesen, Tate)
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 Amended Proposed Summons (BLM) Filed by Cahill Ranches, Inc.. (Justesen, Tate)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order, #3 . Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, if any, is to be filed by 1/18/2022. Dispositive Motions are due by 2/14/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/18/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/14/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 2/14/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Cahill Ranches, Inc.. (Justesen, Tate)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8234368 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Cahill Ranches, Inc. against Bureau of Land Management (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons). (Justesen, Tate)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cahill Ranches, Inc. v. Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cahill Ranches, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron E. Bruner
Represented By: Tate F. Justesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Oregon Natural Desert Ass'n
Represented By: Peter Macnamara Lacy
Represented By: David H. Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?