Friends of Animals v. Rose et al
Plaintiff: Friends of Animals
Defendant: The United States Bureau of Land Management, Jeffrey Rose and United States Bureau of Land Management
Case Number: 2:2018cv01850
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Patricia Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 5 U.S.C. ยง 706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Filed by All Defendants. (Sheffield, Sarah)
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 Notice of Related Case Filed by All Defendants. (Sheffield, Sarah)
November 7, 2018 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed as to United States Bureau of Land Management served on 10/24/2018, answer due on 12/28/2018. Service specifically made upon Regional Counsel or Agency. (Harris, Michael)
November 7, 2018 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed as to United States Bureau of Land Management served on 10/29/2018, answer due on 12/28/2018. Service specifically made upon U.S. Attorney General. (Harris, Michael)
November 7, 2018 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed as to United States Bureau of Land Management served on 10/24/2018, answer due on 12/28/2018. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney. (Harris, Michael)
November 7, 2018 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed as to United States Bureau of Land Management served on 10/29/2018, answer due on 12/28/2018. Service specifically made upon Regional Counsel or Agency. (Harris, Michael)
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance of Sarah Sheffield appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Sheffield, Sarah)
October 24, 2018 Filing 9 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Courtney McVean (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: cmcvean. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Courtney McVean for Friends of Animals. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5603894 issued. Signed on 20/24/2018 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (ecp)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael R. Harris for Friends of Animals. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5603878 issued. Signed on 10/24/2018 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (ecp)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Courtney McVean . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5603894. Filed by Friends of Animals. (Smale, Jonathan)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael R. Harris . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5603878. Filed by Friends of Animals. (Smale, Jonathan)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jeffrey Rose, United States Bureau of Land Management. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 Issued Summons Rose) (ecp)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/19/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/21/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 3/21/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (ecp)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Friends of Animals. (Smale, Jonathan)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5601169 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Friends of Animals against All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons). (Smale, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friends of Animals v. Rose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Rose
Represented By: Sarah Sheffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Sarah Sheffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of Animals
Represented By: Jonathan C. Smale
Represented By: Michael R. Harris
Represented By: Courtney McVean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?