Strojnik v. Provenance Fund Acquisition, LLC
Plaintiff: Peter Strojnik
Defendant: Provenance Fund Acquisition, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01869
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Peter Strojnik. (Strojnik, Peter)
December 11, 2018 Filing 11 60-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been informed by pro se Plaintiff and defense counsel that this action has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to LR 41-1, this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs and with leave, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to have this order of dismissal set aside and the action reinstated if the settlement is not consummated. Pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. All pretrial deadlines are stricken. By Clerk of Court Mary L. Moran. (gw)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 Notice of Settlement Filed by Peter Strojnik. (Strojnik, Peter)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF No. #7 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 12/11/2018. Ordered on 11/28/2018 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Provenance Fund Acquisition, LLC. (Clifford, Dwain)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by Provenance Fund Acquisition, LLC. (Clifford, Dwain)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Peter Strojnik (Pro Se Filer admission). Your login is: pstrojnik. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting (ECF No. #4 ) Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party (CM/ECF Registered User). Signed on 11/8/2018 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Mailed copy of order to Plaintiff.) (gw)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party. Filed by Peter Strojnik. (ecp)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Provenance Fund Acquisition, LLC. (Mailed to plaintiff this date.) (sss)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/22/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/25/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 3/25/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Mailed to plaintiff this date.) (sss)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Receipt No. 80536. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Peter Strojnik against Provenance Fund Acquisition, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (sss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strojnik v. Provenance Fund Acquisition, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provenance Fund Acquisition, LLC
Represented By: Dwain M. Clifford
Represented By: James T. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Strojnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?