United States of America v. Hansen
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Mark Hansen
Case Number: 3:2018cv01946
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery of Defaulted Student Loans
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Mark Hansen waiver sent on 12/4/2018. Filed by United States of America. (dsg)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons sent to Mark Hansen on November 8, 2018 by United States of America. Waiver of Service is due by 12/10/2018. Filed by United States of America. (Bickers, Kathleen)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/8/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/8/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 4/8/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (rs)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)) Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by United States of America against Mark Hansen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet). (Bickers, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kathleen Louise Bickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?