Roberts v. Tektronix, Inc.

Plaintiff: Mark Roberts
Defendant: Tektronix, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02087
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: Oregon District Court
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 8 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Mark Roberts (Pro Se Filer admission). Your login is: mroberts. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
January 10, 2019 7 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Mark Roberts regarding Order on Application for CMECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party #6 . (kms)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER: Granting #3 Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party (CM/ECF Registered User). Signed on 1/10/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
January 9, 2019 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Tektronix, Inc.. (Livett, Caroline)
January 9, 2019 4 Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 . Filed by Tektronix, Inc.. (Livett, Caroline)
December 18, 2018 3 Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party. Filed by Mark Roberts. (sss)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/4/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/6/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 5/6/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Mailed to plaintiff this date.) (sss)
December 5, 2018 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Receipt No. 81189. Summons issued as to Tektronix, Inc.. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Mark Roberts against Tektronix, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Issued). (sss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Tektronix, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tektronix, Inc.
Represented By: Laura E. Rosenbaum
Represented By: Caroline J. Livett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?