Strojnik v. Live McMinnville, LLC
Plaintiff: Peter Strojnik
Defendant: Live McMinnville, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02172
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #8 . Answer is due by 3/6/2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jy)
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 Declaration of G. Kevin Kiely in Support of Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Filed by Live McMinnville, LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #8 .) (Kiely, G.)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint. Filed by Live McMinnville, LLC. (Kiely, G.)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Peter Strojnik (Pro Se Filer admission). Your login is: pstrojnik. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password if needed. (ecp)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting #5 Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party (CM/ECF Registered User). Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party. Filed by Peter Strojnik. (joha)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Live McMinnville, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha) (Copy Mailed to Plaintiff.)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (eo) Copy mailed to plaintiff.
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/17/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/17/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 5/17/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (joha) (Copy Mailed to Plaintiff.)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Receipt No. 81420. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Peter Strojnik against Live McMinnville, LLC (Attachments: #1 Addendum, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strojnik v. Live McMinnville, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live McMinnville, LLC
Represented By: G. Kevin Kiely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Strojnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?