Stirling v. China et al
Plaintiff: John Philip Stirling
Defendant: People Republic and China
Petitioner: Brian Olson and Oscar Marquez
Case Number: 3:2020cv00713
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit. Related Documents: Scheduling,, Order, #10 . Filed by John Philip Stirling. (dsg)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court ORDERS Stirling to submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis, or pay the $400 filing fee, within twenty-one days of the date of this Order. Failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this proceeding. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to send Stirling a form application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on 6/16/2020 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (This Order and IFP form Mailed to Pro Se Party on 6/16/2020.) (joha)
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 Motion for Default Judgment. Filed by John Philip Stirling. (joha)
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service Agreement Between Parties. Filed by John Philip Stirling. (dsg)
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 Response to Magistrate Beckerman's Order for Payment of Filing Fees. Filed by John Philip Stirling. (Related document(s): Scheduling, #6 .) (dsg)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Stirling has neither submitted the requisite $400.00 nor moved to proceed in forma pauperis. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS Stirling to submit $400.00 or an application to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days of the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this proceeding. Signed on 5/13/2020 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman.(Mailed order and IFP application to Pro Se party on 5/13/2020.) (dsg)
May 11, 2020 Filing 5 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (joha)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 4/30/2020.) (dsg)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 Motion to Join. Filed by Oscar Marquez. (dsg)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to Join. Filed by Brian Olson. (dsg)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. NO FEE, NO IFP. Filed by John Philip Stirling against China, People Republic. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stirling v. China et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Philip Stirling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People Republic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Oscar Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?