K.L.J. v. Yee et al
Plaintiff: K.L.J.
Defendant: Beaverton School District and Timothy Yee
Case Number: 3:2020cv01664
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 11 Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by K.L.J.. (Riddell, Sean)
October 20, 2020 Filing 10 Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (sb)
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Scheduling Order by Judge Acosta: Telephone Rule 16 Conference is SET for Tuesday, December 15, 2020 at 10:00 AM in Portland by telephone before Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. The Court's conference call information shall be provided by separate sealed entry. (pjg)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand Defendant Timothy Yee's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. Filed by Timothy Yee. (Scholz, Jack)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 Defendant Beaverton School District's Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by Beaverton School District. (Porter, J.)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Service by Beaverton School District of Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order, #2 Filed by Beaverton School District. (Porter, J.)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 1/22/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/22/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 2/22/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (sb)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV29242 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7275895 issued.. Filed by Beaverton School District (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Porter, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K.L.J. v. Yee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beaverton School District
Represented By: J. Michael Porter
Represented By: Erin M. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Yee
Represented By: Carey Caldwell
Represented By: Jack R. Scholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.L.J.
Represented By: Sean J. Riddell
Represented By: Erin S. Greenawald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?