Bjork v. Peters et al
Plaintiff: Craig Bjork
Defendant: Randy Briones, Jamie Breyman, Colette Peters, Michael Gower, Judy Gilmore, Greg Jones, Brandon Kelly, Sallie Jurgensmeier, Curt Wagner and R. Adamson
Case Number: 6:2019cv00981
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. **PRINT NEF ONLY. The Court will e-mail a PDF of the Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge form filed in this case to SRCI for delivery to the inmate litigant.**(Craig Bjork, Prisoner ID: 19907792)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by All Defendants. Filed by All Defendants.**PRINT ALL**(Craig Bjork, Prisoner ID: 19907792) (Vincent, Shannon)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time #7 to file a Waiver of Service. Waiver of Service is now due by 8/8/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Craig Bjork, Prisoner ID: 19907792) (rsm)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 Declaration of Shannon Vincent In Support of Motion to Extend Time (First). Filed by Colette Peters. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time #7 .)**PRINT ALL**(Craig Bjork, Prisoner ID: 19907792) (Vincent, Shannon)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for Extension of Time (First). Filed by Colette Peters.**PRINT ALL**(Craig Bjork, Prisoner ID: 19907792) (Vincent, Shannon)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver of Service is due by 7/25/2019.**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Craig Bjork, Prisoner ID: 19907792) (Copy along with complaint and exhibits e-mailed to DOJ.) (kf)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER: The U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-7, participation in the E-Filing Program is mandatory for all unrepresented inmate litigants incarcerated at the Snake River Correctional Institution. Please comply by submitting documents to be filed with this Court to the library coordinator for scanning. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Craig Bjork, Prisoner ID: 19907792) (kf)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Craig Bjork, Prisoner ID: 19907792) (kf)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Craig Bjork.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Craig Bjork, Prisoner ID: 19907792) (kf)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel filed by Craig Bjork.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Craig Bjork, Prisoner ID: 19907792) (kf)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Receipt No. 12988. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Craig Bjork against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons).**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Craig Bjork, Prisoner ID: 19907792) (kf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bjork v. Peters et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Briones
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Breyman
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colette Peters
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gower
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Gilmore
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Jones
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Kelly
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sallie Jurgensmeier
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curt Wagner
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Adamson
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Bjork
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?