Black Unity et al v. City of Springfield et al
Plaintiff: Martin Allums, Black Unity, Mya Lansing, Tyshawn Ford and Austin Johns
Defendant: Bronson Durrant, John Doe, Sgt. David Grice, Lt. Matthew Neiwart, C. J. O'Leary, City of Springfield, Sgt. Keith Seanor, R. J. Conrad, Chief Richard L. Lewis, B. K. Bragg, T. J. Murray, T. J. Bazer, Detective Robert Weaver, L. E. Turner, Daniel Casarez, J. J. Myers, J. M. Wilson, Jared Quinones, Sgt. Pete Kirkpatrick, A. A. Amundson, Lt. George Crolly, Lt. Tom Rappe, B. P. Dunn, M. J. Thomsen, R. A. Rosales, E. A. Sorby, J. Garcia-Cash and Joseph Burke
Case Number: 6:2021cv00346
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Filing 34 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Robert Weaver waiver sent on 4/29/2021. Filed by Robert Weaver. (Montoya, Kenneth)
April 29, 2021 Filing 33 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by R. A. Rosales waiver sent on 4/29/2021. Filed by R. A. Rosales. (Montoya, Kenneth)
April 9, 2021 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance of Sarah Ann Alvarez appearing on behalf of Tyshawn Ford Filed by on behalf of Tyshawn Ford. (Alvarez, Sarah)
April 5, 2021 Filing 31 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Jared Quinones waiver sent on 3/24/2021. Filed by Jared Quinones. (Franz, Robert)
April 5, 2021 Filing 30 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by E. A. Sorby waiver sent on 3/24/2021. Filed by E. A. Sorby. (Franz, Robert)
April 5, 2021 Filing 29 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by A. A. Amundson waiver sent on 3/24/2021. Filed by A. A. Amundson. (Franz, Robert)
March 31, 2021 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance of Thomas F. Armosino appearing on behalf of City of Springfield Filed by on behalf of City of Springfield. (Armosino, Thomas)
March 31, 2021 Filing 27 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by City of Springfield waiver sent on 3/18/2021. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dugan, Marianne)
March 24, 2021 Filing 26 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by J. M. Wilson waiver sent on 3/24/2021. Filed by J. M. Wilson. (Franz, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Filing 25 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by L. E. Turner waiver sent on 3/24/2021. Filed by L. E. Turner. (Franz, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Filing 24 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by M. J. Thomsen waiver sent on 3/24/2021. Filed by M. J. Thomsen. (Franz, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Filing 23 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by C. J. O'Leary waiver sent on 3/24/2021. Filed by C. J. O'Leary. (Franz, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Filing 22 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by J. J. Myers waiver sent on 3/24/2021. Filed by J. J. Myers. (Franz, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Filing 21 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by T. J. Murray waiver sent on 3/24/2021. Filed by T. J. Murray. (Franz, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Filing 20 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by J. Garcia-Cash waiver sent on 3/24/2021. Filed by J. Garcia-Cash. (Franz, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Filing 19 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Bronson Durrant waiver sent on 3/24/2021. Filed by Bronson Durrant. (Franz, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Filing 18 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by B. P. Dunn waiver sent on 3/24/2021. Filed by B. P. Dunn. (Franz, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Filing 17 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by R. J. Conrad waiver sent on 3/24/2021. Filed by R. J. Conrad. (Franz, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Filing 16 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Daniel Casarez waiver sent on 3/24/2021. Filed by Daniel Casarez. (Franz, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Filing 15 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Joseph Burke waiver sent on 3/24/2021. Filed by Joseph Burke. (Franz, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Filing 14 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by B. K. Bragg waiver sent on 3/24/2021. Filed by B. K. Bragg. (Franz, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Filing 13 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by T. J. Bazer waiver sent on 3/24/2021. Filed by T. J. Bazer. (Franz, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Filing 12 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Keith Seanor waiver sent on 3/24/2021. Filed by Keith Seanor. (Franz, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Filing 11 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Pete Kirkpatrick waiver sent on 3/24/2021. Filed by Pete Kirkpatrick. (Franz, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Filing 10 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by David Grice waiver sent on 3/24/2021. Filed by David Grice. (Franz, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Filing 9 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Tom Rappe waiver sent on 3/24/2021. Filed by Tom Rappe. (Franz, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Filing 8 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Matthew Neiwart waiver sent on 3/24/2021. Filed by Matthew Neiwart. (Franz, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Filing 7 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by George Crolly waiver sent on 3/24/2021. Filed by George Crolly. (Franz, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Filing 6 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Richard L. Lewis waiver sent on 3/24/2021. Filed by Richard L. Lewis. (Franz, Robert)
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 Summons Lewis, #2 Summons Crolly, #3 Summons Neiwart, #4 Summons Rappe, #5 Summons Grice, #6 Summons Kirkpatrick, #7 Summons Seanor, #8 Summons Amundson, #9 Summons Bazer, #10 Summons Bragg, #11 Summons Burke, #12 Summons Casarez, #13 Summons Conrad, #14 Summons Dunn, #15 Summons Durrant, #16 Summons Garcia-Cash, #17 Summons Murray, #18 Summons Myers, #19 Summons OLeary, #20 Summons Quinones, #21 Summons Rosales, #22 Summons Sorby, #23 Summons Thomsen, #24 Summons Turner, #25 Summons Wilson, #26 Summons Weaver, #27 Summons Doe) (jw)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dugan, Marianne)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 7/6/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/5/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 8/5/2021. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (jw)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 3/8/2021 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7981271 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Martin Allums, Black Unity, Tyshawn Ford, Austin Johns, Mya Lansing against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Regan, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black Unity et al v. City of Springfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bronson Durrant
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. David Grice
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Matthew Neiwart
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. J. O'Leary
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Springfield
Represented By: Thomas F. Armosino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Keith Seanor
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. J. Conrad
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Richard L. Lewis
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. K. Bragg
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. J. Murray
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. J. Bazer
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Robert Weaver
Represented By: Kenneth S. Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. E. Turner
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Casarez
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. J. Myers
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. M. Wilson
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Quinones
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Pete Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. A. Amundson
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. George Crolly
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Tom Rappe
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. P. Dunn
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. J. Thomsen
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. A. Rosales
Represented By: Kenneth S. Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. A. Sorby
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Garcia-Cash
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Burke
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Allums
Represented By: Lauren C. Regan
Represented By: Marianne G. Dugan
Represented By: Sarah Ann Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black Unity
Represented By: Lauren C. Regan
Represented By: Marianne G. Dugan
Represented By: Sarah Ann Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mya Lansing
Represented By: Lauren C. Regan
Represented By: Marianne G. Dugan
Represented By: Sarah Ann Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyshawn Ford
Represented By: Lauren C. Regan
Represented By: Marianne G. Dugan
Represented By: Sarah Ann Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Johns
Represented By: Lauren C. Regan
Represented By: Marianne G. Dugan
Represented By: Sarah Ann Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?