21st Century Centennial Insurance Company et al v. Bonneville Power Administration et al
Plaintiff: 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, Agent Alliance Insurance Company, Allied Insurance Company of America, Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, A Nationwide Company, Amco Insurance Company, A Nationwide Company, American Bankers Insurance Company, American Federation Insurance Company, American Reliable Insurance Company, American Security Insurance Company, Amica General Agency, Inc., Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Amica Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, California Casualty Indemnity Exchange, Century National Insurance Company, Civic Property and Casualty Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company, Crestbrook Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company, a Nationwide Company, Diamond State Insurance Company, Economy Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Economy Preferred Insurance Company, Economy Premier Assurance Company, Exact Property and Casualty Company, Farmers Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Direct Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Group Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Company of Columbus, Farmers Insurance Company of Idaho, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas, Farmers New Century Insurance Company, Farmers Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Specialty Insurance Company, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Farmland Mutual Insurance Company, Fire Insurance Exchange, Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Lloyds of Texas, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Foremost Signature Insurance Company, Freedom Specialty Insurance Company, Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Harleysville Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company Of The Midwest, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Integon National Insurance Company, Integon Preferred Insurance Company, Metropolitan General Insurance Company, MIC General Insurance Corporation, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company of Texas, National Casualty Company, National Farmers Union Property and Casualty Company, National General Assurance Company, National General Insurance Company, National General Insurance Online, Inc., National General Premier Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance - NAIC, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Nationwide General Insurance Company, Nationwide Indemnity Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Joint Underwriting, Nationwide Lloyds Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Neighborhood Spirit Property and Casualty Company, Northfield Insurance Company, Penn-America Insurance Company, Penn-Patriot Insurance Company, Penn-Star Insurance Company, Property And Casualty Insurance Company Of Hartford, Scottsdale Indemnity Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company, Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Security National Insurance Company, Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Texas Farmers Insurance Company, Titan Insurance Company, Toggle Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange, The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut, The Standard Fire Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Travelers Personal Insurance Company, Trumbull Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company, United National Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company, Western Heritage Insurance Company, Ace American Insurance Company, AGCS Marine Insurance Company, American Commerce Insurance Company, American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company, American Strategic Insurance Corp., Armed Forces Insurance Exchange, Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company, Bankers Standard Insurance Company, Church Mutual Insurance Company, Commerce West Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Country Preferred Insurance Company, Enumclaw Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, First American Property and Casualty Company, Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest, Mutual of Enumclaw Insurance Company, Oregon Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, Rainier Insurance Company, Red Shield Insurance Company, AIG Property Casualty Company, AIG Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, American Home Assurance Company, Liberty Specialty Markets Agency Limited, The Cincinnati Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, The Hanover American Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, State Farm Fire And Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Dairyland Insurance Company, Markel American Insurance Company, Middlesex Insurance Company, Sentry Select Insurance Company, Viking Insurance Company of Wisconsin, California Casualty General Insurance Company of Oregon, National General Insurance Online, Inc, Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Conneticut, Standard Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Cincinnate Insurance Company, Cincinnati Casualty Company and Hanover American Insurance Company
Defendant: Bonneville Power Administration, Eugene Water & Electric Board, Lane Electric Cooperative, Inc. and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 6:2024cv00089
Filed: January 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2674 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2024 Filing 51 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #47 Attorney Appearance, #46 Attorney Appearance. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The case number on the PDF did not match the case in which it was filed. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded to replace the incorrect one. The Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) will be regenerated to all parties.. (cw)
March 5, 2024 Filing 50 Notice of Appearance of Jonathan W. Monson appearing on behalf of Eugene Water & Electric Board. Filed by on behalf of Eugene Water & Electric Board. (Monson, Jonathan)
March 5, 2024 Filing 49 Notice of Appearance of G. Kevin Kiely appearing on behalf of Eugene Water & Electric Board. Filed by on behalf of Eugene Water & Electric Board. (Kiely, G.)
March 5, 2024 Filing 48 Notice of Appearance of Nicole M. Swift appearing on behalf of Eugene Water & Electric Board. Filed by on behalf of Eugene Water & Electric Board. (Swift, Nicole)
March 5, 2024 Filing 47 Notice of Appearance of Brian Epley appearing on behalf of Eugene Water & Electric Board. Filed by on behalf of Eugene Water & Electric Board. (Epley, Brian) (Main Document 47 replaced on 3/11/2024) (cw).
March 5, 2024 Filing 46 Notice of Appearance of Nicole A.W. Abercrombie appearing on behalf of Eugene Water & Electric Board. Filed by on behalf of Eugene Water & Electric Board. (Abercrombie, Nicole) (Main Document 46 replaced on 3/11/2024) (cw).
March 4, 2024 Filing 45 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Eugene Water & Electric Board waiver sent on 3/4/2024. Filed by Eugene Water & Electric Board. (Abercrombie, Nicole)
March 4, 2024 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by AGCS Marine Insurance Company. (Campbell, Bryan)
March 4, 2024 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Campbell, Bryan)
February 29, 2024 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Campbell, Bryan)
February 29, 2024 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Campbell, Bryan)
February 29, 2024 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by American Family Insurance Company. (Campbell, Bryan)
February 29, 2024 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Campbell, Bryan)
February 29, 2024 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Country Preferred Insurance Company. (Campbell, Bryan)
February 29, 2024 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Campbell, Bryan)
February 29, 2024 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Campbell, Bryan)
February 29, 2024 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company. (Campbell, Bryan)
February 29, 2024 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Mutual of Enumclaw Insurance Company. (Campbell, Bryan)
February 29, 2024 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Enumclaw Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Campbell, Bryan)
February 29, 2024 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Commerce West Insurance Company. (Campbell, Bryan)
February 29, 2024 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by American Commerce Insurance Company. (Campbell, Bryan)
February 29, 2024 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Progressive Universal Insurance Company. (Campbell, Bryan)
February 29, 2024 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Campbell, Bryan)
February 29, 2024 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Campbell, Bryan)
February 29, 2024 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Progressive Classic Insurance Company. (Campbell, Bryan)
February 29, 2024 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. (Campbell, Bryan)
February 29, 2024 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Rainier Insurance Company. (Campbell, Bryan)
February 29, 2024 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Campbell, Bryan)
February 29, 2024 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Armed Forces Insurance Exchange. (Campbell, Bryan)
February 29, 2024 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by First American Property and Casualty Company. (Campbell, Bryan)
February 29, 2024 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Oregon Mutual Insurance Company. (Campbell, Bryan)
February 21, 2024 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Northfield Insurance Company, Standard Fire Insurance Company, The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Travelers Personal Insurance Company. (Brennan, Christopher)
February 21, 2024 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company Of The Midwest, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Property And Casualty Insurance Company Of Hartford, Trumbull Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Brennan, Christopher)
February 12, 2024 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance of Andrew Todd Burns appearing on behalf of Lane Electric Cooperative, Inc.. Filed by on behalf of Lane Electric Cooperative, Inc.. (Burns, Andrew)
February 9, 2024 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance of Marnie Silver appearing on behalf of Dairyland Insurance Company, Markel American Insurance Company, Middlesex Insurance Company, Sentry Select Insurance Company, Viking Insurance Company of Wisconsin. Filed by on behalf of Dairyland Insurance Company, Markel American Insurance Company, Middlesex Insurance Company, Sentry Select Insurance Company, Viking Insurance Company of Wisconsin. (Silver, Marnie)
February 2, 2024 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Liberty Specialty Markets Agency Limited. (Smith, Carson)
February 2, 2024 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Smith, Carson)
February 2, 2024 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by American Home Assurance Company. (Smith, Carson)
February 2, 2024 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Smith, Carson)
February 2, 2024 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Lexington Insurance Company. (Smith, Carson)
February 2, 2024 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Smith, Carson)
February 2, 2024 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by AIG Specialty Insurance Company. (Smith, Carson)
February 2, 2024 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by State Farm Fire And Casualty Company. (Smith, Carson)
February 2, 2024 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Smith, Carson)
February 2, 2024 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by The Cincinnati Casualty Company. (Smith, Carson)
February 2, 2024 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by The Hanover American Insurance Company. (Smith, Carson)
January 25, 2024 Filing 5 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Lane Electric Cooperative, Inc. waiver sent on 1/22/2024. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brennan, Christopher)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order signed on 1/18/2024 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
January 17, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bonneville Power Administration, Eugene Water & Electric Board, Lane Electric Cooperative, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 Summons EWEB, #2 Summons Lane Electric) (jw)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/16/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/17/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 6/17/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jw)
January 16, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9236350 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by American Bankers Insurance Company, American Commerce Insurance Company, American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., American Federation Insurance Company, American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company, American Home Assurance Company, American Reliable Insurance Company, American Security Insurance Company, American Strategic Insurance Corp., Amica General Agency, Inc., Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Amica Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Armed Forces Insurance Exchange, Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company, Bankers Standard Insurance Company, Bristol West Insurance Company, California Casualty General Insurance Company of Oregon, California Casualty Indemnity Exchange, Century National Insurance Company, Church Mutual Insurance Company, Civic Property and Casualty Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company, Commerce West Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Country Preferred Insurance Company, Crestbrook Insurance Company, Dairyland Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company, a Nationwide Company, Diamond State Insurance Company, Economy Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Economy Preferred Insurance Company, Economy Premier Assurance Company, Enumclaw Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Exact Property and Casualty Company, Farmers Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Direct Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Group Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Company of Columbus, Farmers Insurance Company of Idaho, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Farmers Insurance Company of Washington, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas, Farmers New Century Insurance Company, Farmers Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Specialty Insurance Company, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Farmland Mutual Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Fire Insurance Exchange, First American Property and Casualty Company, Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Lloyds of Texas, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Foremost Signature Insurance Company, Freedom Specialty Insurance Company, Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Harleysville Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company Of The Midwest, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Integon National Insurance Company, Integon Preferred Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Liberty Specialty Markets Agency Limited, MIC General Insurance Corporation, Markel American Insurance Company, Metropolitan General Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company of Texas, Middlesex Insurance Company, Mutual of Enumclaw Insurance Company, National Casualty Company, National Farmers Union Property and Casualty Company, National General Assurance Company, National General Insurance Company, National General Insurance Online, Inc., National General Premier Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance - NAIC, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Nationwide General Insurance Company, Nationwide Indemnity Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Joint Underwriting, Nationwide Lloyds Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Neighborhood Spirit Property and Casualty Company, Northfield Insurance Company, Oregon Mutual Insurance Company, Penn-America Insurance Company, Penn-Patriot Insurance Company, Penn-Star Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, Property And Casualty Insurance Company Of Hartford, Rainier Insurance Company, Red Shield Insurance Company, Scottsdale Indemnity Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company, Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Security National Insurance Company, Sentry Select Insurance Company, Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Fire And Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Texas Farmers Insurance Company, The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company, The Hanover American Insurance Company, The Standard Fire Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Titan Insurance Company, Toggle Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Travelers Personal Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange, Trumbull Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United National Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Viking Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company, Western Heritage Insurance Company, 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, AGCS Marine Insurance Company, AIG Property Casualty Company, AIG Specialty Insurance Company, Ace American Insurance Company, Agent Alliance Insurance Company, Allied Insurance Company of America, Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, A Nationwide Company, Amco Insurance Company, A Nationwide Company against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons - Bonneville Power Administration, #3 Proposed Summons Summons - Eugene Water & Electric, #4 Proposed Summons Summons - Lane Electric Cooperative, Inc.). (Brennan, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company et al v. Bonneville Power Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 21st Century Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agent Alliance Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, A Nationwide Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amco Insurance Company, A Nationwide Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Bankers Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Federation Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Reliable Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amica General Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amica Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bristol West Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Casualty Indemnity Exchange
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Century National Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Civic Property and Casualty Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coast National Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crestbrook Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Depositors Insurance Company, a Nationwide Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond State Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Economy Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Economy Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Economy Premier Assurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exact Property and Casualty Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Direct Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Group Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Insurance Company of Columbus
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Insurance Company of Idaho
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Insurance Company of Washington
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers New Century Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmland Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fire Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foremost Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foremost Lloyds of Texas
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foremost Signature Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harleysville Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Insurance Company Of The Midwest
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois Farmers Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Integon National Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Integon Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan General Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIC General Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-Century Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-Century Insurance Company of Texas
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Casualty Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Farmers Union Property and Casualty Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National General Assurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National General Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National General Insurance Online, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National General Premier Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance - NAIC
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Joint Underwriting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Lloyds Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neighborhood Spirit Property and Casualty Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northfield Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penn-America Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penn-Patriot Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penn-Star Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Property And Casualty Insurance Company Of Hartford
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Indemnity Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Security National Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Standard Guaranty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Farmers Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Titan Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toggle Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Truck Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Commercial Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Personal Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trumbull Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United National Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Services Automobile Association
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USAA General Indemnity Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Heritage Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGCS Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Commerce Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Family Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armed Forces Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bankers Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commerce West Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Country Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Country Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enumclaw Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First American Property and Casualty Company
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mutual of Enumclaw Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oregon Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Classic Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Universal Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive West Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rainier Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Shield Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIG Property Casualty Company
Represented By: Carson O. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIG Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Carson O. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Carson O. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Home Assurance Company
Represented By: Carson O. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Specialty Markets Agency Limited
Represented By: Carson O. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Carson O. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Cincinnati Casualty Company
Represented By: Carson O. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Hanover American Insurance Company
Represented By: Carson O. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Carson O. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire And Casualty Company
Represented By: Carson O. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Carson O. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dairyland Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Represented By: Marnie Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markel American Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Represented By: Marnie Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Middlesex Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Represented By: Marnie Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sentry Select Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Represented By: Marnie Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viking Insurance Company of Wisconsin
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Represented By: Marnie Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Casualty General Insurance Company of Oregon
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National General Insurance Online, Inc
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Conneticut
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Standard Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Represented By: Christopher James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cincinnate Insurance Company
Represented By: Carson O. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Casualty Company
Represented By: Carson O. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanover American Insurance Company
Represented By: Carson O. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonneville Power Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Water & Electric Board
Represented By: Nicole A.W. Abercrombie
Represented By: Brian Epley
Represented By: G. Kevin Kiely
Represented By: Jonathan W. Monson
Represented By: Nicole M. Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Todd Burns
Represented By: Brandon L. Thornburg
Represented By: Joshua R. Kennedy
Represented By: Julie Annette Smith
Represented By: Shayna Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?