HOPKINS et al v. AC & S, INC. et al
Plaintiff: BETTY K. HOPKINS and CURTIS HOPKINS
Defendant: WEIL MCLAIN COMPANY, INC., MORSE-DIESEL INTERNATIONAL, INC., GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION, A.P. GREEN SERVICES, INC., AMERICAN STANDARD, INC., STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC., GASKET HOLDINGS, INC., FREIGHTLINER CORPORATION, DEERE & CO., QUIGLEY COMPANY, INC., UNION CARBIDE, DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION, FEDERAL-MOGUL PRODUCTS, INC., ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY, OWENS ILLINOIS, INC., CRANE CO., PATTERSON PUMP COMPANY, OAKFABCO, INC., PORTER HAYDEN COMPANY, J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES CO., AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY, INC., FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION, TDY INDUSTRIES, INC., VIACOM, INC., HONEYWELL CORP., PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC., DB RILEY, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, AC & S, INC., BMCE INC., PACCAR, INC., U.S. RUBBER COMPANY (UNIROYAL), DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY, CONGOLEUM CORPORATION, INGERSOLL-RAND CO., MCCORD CORPORATION, MOTION CONTROL INDUSTRIES, INC., WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE COMPANY, GIBRALTAR INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC., RAPID AMERICAN CORPORATION, DANA CORPORATION, MACK TRUCKS, INC., GOODYEAR CANADA, INC., A. W. CHESTERTON COMPANY, LIPE-AUTOMATION CORP., FULTON BOILER WORKS, INC., SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC., MAREMONT CORPORATION, MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY, CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, PATTERSON KELLY DIVISION, GOULD PUMPS, INC., GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY, CATERPILLAR, INC., REYNOLDS METALS COMPANY, T&N, PLC, BORG-WARNER CORPORATION, FERODO AMERICAN INC., PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION, DRESSER INDUSTRIES, INC., WORTHINGTON CORPORATION, KAISER ALUMINUM AND CHEMICAL CORPORATION, BURNHAM CORPORATION, A.P. GREEN INDUSTRIES, INC., INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION, NORTH AMERICAN REFRACTORIES COMPANY, AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION, PERKINS ENGINES, INC., KOHLER CO., FORD MOTOR COMPANY, CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY, INC., CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY, INC., H.B. FULLER COMPANY, KENTILE FLOORS, INC., KEELER-DORR-OLIVER BOILER COMPANY, GARLOCK, INC., HARBISON-WALKER REFRACTORIES COMPANY, PLIBRICO COMPANY, LOCKHEED MARTIN CORP., UNITED STATES MINERAL PRODUCTS COMPANY and PFIZER, INC.
Case Number: 2:2009cv82980
Filed: September 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS AGAINST ALL THE VIABLE DEFENDANTS IN THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT A ATTACHED ARE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CASES WILL BE TRANSFERRED TO THE BANKRUPTCY ONLY DOCKET. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/2/10. 6/30/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED(tj, )
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS AGAINST ALL THE VIABLE DEFENDANTS IN THE CASES LISTED IN "EXHIBIT A", ATTACHED, ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO FILE SEVERED AND AMENDED COMPLAINTS. SEE PAPER #7281 IN CASE 01-875 FOR FULL CASE LIST. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/12/2010. 5/28/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (aeg, )
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT A STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASES ON JUNE 2, 2010 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 11A. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE CONFERENCE SHALL RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/29/10. (SEE #7236 IN 01-MD-875 FOR LIST OF CASES) 5/7/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(lbc, )
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE RULE TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WILL BE HELD ON 5/12/2010 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11A, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106; FAILURE FOR THE PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL'S TO APPEAR OR TO BE EXCUSED FROM APPEARING WILL RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THE PLAINTIFF'S CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. (SEE 01-MD-875 PAPER # 7146 FOR LIST OF CASES) SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/13/2010. 4/20/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED (kk, )
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THE UNDERSIGNED HEREBY CONSENT TO THE SUBSTITUTION OF MICHAEL A. TANENBAUM, ESQ., OF SEDGWICK, DETERT, MORAN & ARNOLD LLP, AS ATTORNEYS FOR THE DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, IN ALL MATTERS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED DOCKET SHEET. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/23/10. 3/19/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
January 28, 2010 Filing 2 MOTION AND ORDER THAT RICHARD ADAM SENZER AS COUNSEL OF RECORD IS WITHDRAWN AS COUNSEL AND AMIEL GROSS IS SUBSTITUTED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION IN ALL CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A". SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/19/10. 1/28/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ah)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER THAT, WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS, EACH INDIVIDUAL PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE ONE SEVERED AND AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THIS COURT. THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IS DIRECTED TO ASSIGN CIVIL ACTION NUMBERS TO EACH INDIVIDUAL PLAINTIFF. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS SECTION OF THE INSTANT ORDER MAY RESULT, UPON MOTION BY ANY CONCERNED DEFENDANT OR BY RULE TO SHOW CAUSE ISSUED BY THE COURT, IN THE DISMISSAL OF THAT SPECIFIC PLAINTIFFS CIVIL ACTION WITH PREJUDICE, PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(B), ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (nds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOPKINS et al v. AC & S, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIL MCLAIN COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORSE-DIESEL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.P. GREEN SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: JULIE R. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.
Represented By: ERICH GLEBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD P. O'LEARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GASKET HOLDINGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREIGHTLINER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEERE & CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUIGLEY COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL-MOGUL PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWENS ILLINOIS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATTERSON PUMP COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OAKFABCO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORTER HAYDEN COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY M. MCCANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIES CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE OKONITE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: ANNA MARIA DILONARDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHAEL ALAN TANENBAUM
Represented By: JUDITH ANN LOCKHART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDY INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOM, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM J. BRADLEY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL CORP.
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: MATTHEW ROBERT STRAUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DB RILEY, INC.
Represented By: DONALD J. FAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AC & S, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMCE INC.
Represented By: ANNA MARIA DILONARDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACCAR, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. RUBBER COMPANY (UNIROYAL)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONGOLEUM CORPORATION
Represented By: THOMAS A. RHATIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCCORD CORPORATION
Represented By: JULIE R. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOTION CONTROL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: NATHAN AARON GOLDBERG
Represented By: JONATHAN GLENN KORTMANSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIBRALTAR INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAPID AMERICAN CORPORATION
Represented By: RICHARD ADAM SENZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACK TRUCKS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR CANADA, INC.
Represented By: PAULA M. EADE NEWCOMB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. W. CHESTERTON COMPANY
Represented By: JULIE R. EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIPE-AUTOMATION CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FULTON BOILER WORKS, INC.
Represented By: SUZANNE M. HALBARDIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAREMONT CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY J. MCHUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAINTEED CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATTERSON KELLY DIVISION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULD PUMPS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY
Represented By: PAULA M. EADE NEWCOMB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATERPILLAR, INC.
Represented By: O. DANIEL ANSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REYNOLDS METALS COMPANY
Represented By: RAYMOND F. GEOFFREY, III
Represented By: ROBERT M. ROLFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T&N, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORG-WARNER CORPORATION
Represented By: ANNA MARIA DILONARDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FERODO AMERICAN INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION
Represented By: TIMOTHY M. MCCANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRESSER INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORTHINGTON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER ALUMINUM AND CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURNHAM CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.P. GREEN INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHELLE S. REGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH AMERICAN REFRACTORIES COMPANY
Represented By: JAMES D. BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERKINS ENGINES, INC.
Represented By: O. DANIEL ANSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOHLER CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: TERRANCE PATRICK FLYNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: MICHELLE S. REGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.B. FULLER COMPANY
Represented By: VERONICA LAVALLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENTILE FLOORS, INC.
Represented By: CYNTHIA WEISS ANTONUCCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEELER-DORR-OLIVER BOILER COMPANY
Represented By: RICHARD P. MARIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARLOCK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARBISON-WALKER REFRACTORIES COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLIBRICO COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOCKHEED MARTIN CORP.
Represented By: COLLEEN M. CRONIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES MINERAL PRODUCTS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETTY K. HOPKINS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURTIS HOPKINS
Represented By: EDWARD O. MOODY
Represented By: LISA NATHANSON BUSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?