BROWN v. LYONS et al
Plaintiff: ALTON D. BROWN
Defendant: DAY, SEVERAL JOHN DOES, WHITE and R. LYONS
Case Number: 2:2010cv03458
Filed: June 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: RENEE MARIE BUMB
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER THAT THE ORDER DATED 2/14/13 (DOC. NO. 17) GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS MODIFIED TO GRANT IFP STATUS ONLY AS TO THOSE CLAIMS IN THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT THAT ALLEGE A THREAT OF IMMINENT DANGER OR SER IOUS PHYSICAL INJURY AS DESCRIBED IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM. IFP STATUS IS DENIED AS TO ALL OTHER CLAIMS. ACCORDINGLY PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS THAT FAIL TO ALLEGE A THREAT OF IMMINENT DANGER ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE DUE TO PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO PAY THE APPROPRIATE FEE. PLAINTIFF'S REMAINING CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1915(e)(2) AND 1915A. PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR ORDERS REQUIRING SERVICE OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NOS. 20, 22) ARE DENIED AS MOOT. PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (DOC. NOS. 5, 21, 24) ARE DENIED AS MOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/16/13. 10/16/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER. (jpd)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RENEE MARIE BUMB ON 2/22/11. 2/23/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER. (jpd)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO VACATE THE ORDER ENTERED MARCH 15, 2010 IS GRANTED; AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE ORDER ENTERED MARCH 15, 2010 IS VACATED; AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED INFORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT;AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLFF'S REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS, REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMNET REQUEST TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND REQUEST FOR ORDER REQUIRING MARSHAL TO EFFECTUARTE SERVICE ARE DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT; AND IT IS FURTHER ORDER THAT THE CLERK SHALL SERVE THIS ORDE R AND MEMO UPON THE PARTIES WHO HAVE ENTERED AN APPEARANCE AND SHALL TERMINATE THE FILE; AND FINALLY ORDERED THAT IF PLFF PREPAYS THE FILING FEE WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THE ENTRY OF THIS ORDER THEN THIS COURT WILL REOPEN THE FILE AND SCREEN THE COMPLAINT FOR SUA SPONTE DISMISSAL; AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF THE COURT SHALL DOCKET THIS ORDER AND THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORNAUDM OPINION IN CIVIL ACTION NO. 10-3458 WITH THE NOTATION FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RENEE MARIE BUMB ON 2/1/11. 2/1/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL. (jpd) (INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN v. LYONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEVERAL JOHN DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. LYONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALTON D. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?