OLSCHEWSKE et al v. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS
Plaintiff: LINDA OLSCHEWSKE, ELLAMAE PIKE and THOMAS R. OLSCHEWSKE
Defendant: STANDCO, INC., GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION, ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST, STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC., BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE, NORTH AMERICAN TIRE, LLC, BUCYRUS INTERNATIONAL, INC., ROSSENDALE-RUBOIL COMPANY, MINGLEDORFF'S, INC., DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION, STUART-WESTERN, INC., SILVER LINE PRODUCTS, INC., U.S. SPRING & BUMPER COMPANY, GAITE CORPORATION, 3M COMPANY, ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC., H. KRASNE MANUFACTURING COMPANY, MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC., BORGWARNER MORSE TBC, INC., WHEELING BRAKE BLOCK MANUFACTURING COMPANY, EMSCO ASBESTOS COMPANY, A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, MOLDED INDUSTRIAL FRICTION CORPORATION, BELL ASBESTOS MINES LTD, AMERICAN CONFERENCE OF GOVERNMENTAL INDUSTRIAL HYGIENISTS, INC., LASCO BRAKE PRODUCTS, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC., DANA COMPANIES, LLC, BRASSBESTOS BRAKE COMPANY, CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC., QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC., ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS, FORCES MANUFACTURING CORPORATION, GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, MAREMONT CORPORATION, FIBRE & METAL PRODUCTS COMPANY, THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING CO., INC., WESTERN MACARTHUR COMPANY, PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION, VIACOM, INC., J.T. THORPE & SON, INC., AUTO FRICTION CORPORATION, HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC., INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, UNDERWRITERS LABORATORIES, INC., PNEUMO ABEX LLC, MACARTHUR COMPANY, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, RITESET MANUFACTURING COMPANY, AUTO SPECIAL MANUFACTURING COMPANY, UNIVERSAL FRICTION MATERIALS COMPANY, LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP., FORD MOTOR COMPANY, WESTERN ASBESTOS COMPANY, EATON CORPORATION, AS SII TO EATON ELECTRICAL INC. AND CUTLER-HAMMER INC., SOUTHERN FRICTION MATERIALS COMPANY, THE BUDD COMPANY, NATIONAL TRANSPORT SUPPLY, INC., ASBESTOS MANUFACTURING COMPANY and LJ. MILEY COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2010cv78938
Filed: August 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER THAT THE SEVERED PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIMS IN THE CASES ON THE ATTACHED LIST ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/1/2018; 8/2/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (SEE PAPER # 9019 IN 01-MD-875). (tjd)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER THAT A RULE IS ISSUED FOR PLAINTIFFS TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE SEVERED PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIMS IN REMANDED LAND-BASED MDL-875 CASES SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED AS HAVING BEEN SETTLED OR OTHERWISE TERMINATED AFTER REMAND OF THE COMPENSATORY CLAIMS. NO LATER THAN 7/11/2018, ANY PLAINTIFF WHO CONTENDS THAT HE OR SHE HAS A VIABLE PUNITIVE DAMAGE CLAIM THAT WAS SEVERED UPON REMAND OF HIS OR HER COMPENSATORY CLAIMS AND IS PENDING IN THIS COURT SHALL FILE A WRITTEN REPORT OUTLINING THE NATURE AND STATUS OF THE CLAIM. IN ANY SUCH CASES, DEFENDANTS MAY RESPOND NO LATER THAN 8/8/2018. THE COURT WILL THEN ADDRESS THOSE CLAIMS, IF ANY. ALL OTHER PUNITIVE DAMAGE CLAIMS IN REMANDED LAND-BASED CASES, FOR WHICH THE PLAINTIFFS DO NOT FILE REPORTS, WILL BE DISMISSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/2/2018. 5/7/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (SEE PAPER # 9016 IN 01-MD-875) (ems)
September 19, 2012 Certified copy of Conditional Remand Order along with copy of docket mailed to the Northern District of California. (tjd)
September 19, 2012 Filing 51 Copy of Conditional Remand Order from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that all claims in the actions on this order except the severed damages claims be remanded to its respective transferor courts: CA-N 3:09-4676, 09-4756, 09-4782, 09-4803, 09-4881, 4:10-1729, 10-2927, 11-270. (See Paper # 8715 in 01-md-875). (tjd)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER THAT THE COURT SUGGESTS THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE SHOULD BE REMANDED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA FOR RESOLUTION OF ALL MATTERS PENDING WITHIN THIS CASE EXCEPT PUNITIVE DAMAGES, ETC. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/6/12. ) 9/7/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, ) Modified on 9/7/2012 (gn, ).
July 20, 2012 Filing 49 STATUS REPORT RE FINAL PRE-REMAND CONFERENCE ON JULY 24, 2012 by LINDA OLSCHEWSKE, THOMAS R. OLSCHEWSKE, ELLAMAE PIKE. (CHU, KIMBERLY)
July 2, 2012 Filing 48 Disclosure by PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION.(ADAMS, JOSEPH)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER TO DISMISS DEFT SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. f/k/a SQUARE D COMPANY FROM THIS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/14/12. ) 5/15/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
May 10, 2012 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by DEREK S. JOHNSON on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY with Certificate of Service(JOHNSON, DEREK)
May 10, 2012 Filing 45 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs As To SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. f/k/a SQUARE D COMPANY ONLY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN FEES AND COSTS.(DONADIO, DAVID)
April 19, 2012 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of #43 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(BARNES, MICHELE) Modified on 4/20/2012 (md).
April 19, 2012 Filing 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Proposed Order filed by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC..Memorandum.(BARNES, MICHELE)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER THAT THIS COURT DISMISS DEFT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION FROM THIS ACTION WITH PREJDICE. EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN FEES AND COSTS. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/29/12. ) 3/30/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
March 27, 2012 Filing 41 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs As To CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION, ONLY, WITH PREJUDICE. EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN FEES AND COSTS.(DONADIO, DAVID)
March 12, 2012 Filing 40 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by KIMBERLY L. MEYER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (MEYER, KIMBERLY)
March 5, 2012 Filing 39 Disclosure by J.T. THORPE & SON, INC..(BAJAJ, RESHMA)
February 17, 2012 Filing 38 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING CO., INC..(JEFTIC, MIRNA)
February 17, 2012 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by MIRNA JEFTIC on behalf of THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING CO., INC. (JEFTIC, MIRNA)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER THAT THE SCHEDULING ORDER IN THESE CASES, ENTERED ON 9/7/11, IS AMENDED TO READ THAT PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSES (IF ANY) TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE DUE ON 5/21/12, AND DEFENDANTS' REPLIES TO PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSES (IF ANY) ARE DUE 6/4/12. ALL OTHER DATES IN THE SCHEDULING ORDER SHALL REMAIN THE SAME.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/6/12. 2/8/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED (dp, )
February 6, 2012 Filing 35 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC..(BARNES, MICHELE)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER TO DISMISS DEFT CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. FROM THIS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN FEES AND COSTS. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/18/12. ) 1/18/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
January 13, 2012 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs As To CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC., ONLY, WITH PREJUDICE(DONADIO, DAVID)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER THAT THE COURT DISMISS DEFT EATON CORPORATION, AS SII TO EATON ELECTRICAL INC. AND CUTLER-HAMMER INC. FROM THIS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN FEES AND COSTS. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/12/12. ) 1/13/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
January 11, 2012 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs As To EATON CORPORATION, as SII to EATON ELECTRICAL INC and CUTLER-HAMMER INC., ONLY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.(DONADIO, DAVID) Modified on 1/12/2012 (md).
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER THAT THIS COURT DISMISS DEFT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY FROM THIS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN FEES AND COSTS. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/5/12. ) 1/9/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
January 5, 2012 Filing 29 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs As To A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY, ONLY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE(DONADIO, DAVID)
January 3, 2012 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELE CHERIE BARNES on behalf of SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(tomg, )
November 17, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINA MARIE HELWIG on behalf of EATON CORPORATION, AS SII TO EATON ELECTRICAL INC. AND CUTLER-HAMMER INC. with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(HELWIG, CHRISTINA)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER THAT MICHAEL J. STACK, ESQUIRE (DECEASED), IS WITHDRAWN AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANT CROWN CORK & SEAL AND THAT THE APPEARANCE OF PETER V. MARKS, SR., ESQUIRE, IS ENTERED IN HIS PLACE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/21/11. 10/24/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (aeg, )
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER THAT THE DEFT, COOPER INDUSTRIES, LLC F/K/A COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC., IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/20/2011. 10/24/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
October 19, 2011 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs As To COOPER INDUSTRIES, LLC FKA COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC., ONLY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE(DONADIO, DAVID)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER THAT ITT CORPORATION fka ITT INDUSTRIES, INC. RILEY STOKER CORPORATION IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS AND ATTORNEYS' FEES. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/17/11. ) 10/18/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
October 13, 2011 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs As To ITT CORPORATION FKA ITT INDUSTRIES, INC., ONLY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.(DONADIO, DAVID) (COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 10/14/2011 (md).
September 14, 2011 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance of NICOLE E. GAGE on behalf of ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC. (SON, JOHN) Modified on 9/14/2011 (md).
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT THE DEADLINES IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE ARE AS FOLLOWS: ALL DISCOVERY MUST BE COMPLETED BY JANUARY 5, 2012; PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT REPORTS MUST BE SERVED BY FEBRUARY 5, 2012; DEFENDANT'S EXPERT REPORTS MUST BE SERVED BY MARCH 5, 2012; REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORTS MUST BE SERVED BY MARCH 19, 2012; SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS MUST BE FILED BY APRIL 19, 2012; RESPONSES ARE DUE JUNE 19, 2012; REPLIES, IF ANY, ARE DUE JULY 11, 2012; AND A FINAL PRE-REMAND HEARING, INCLUDING ORAL ARGUMENT ON ALL OPPOSED SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS, WILL BE HELD ON TUESDAY, JULY 24, 2012 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11A, JAMES A. BYRNE UNITED STATES COURTHOUSES, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA 19106. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/7/2011. 9/9/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jcab)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL IS HEREBY GRANTED, AND DEFENDANT CRANE CO. IS HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/6/2011. 9/9/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
September 2, 2011 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT for September 6, 2011 Initial Status and Scheduling Conference by LINDA OLSCHEWSKE. (MEYER, KIMBERLY)
August 31, 2011 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs As To DEFENDANT CRANE CO., ONLY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE(DONADIO, DAVID)
August 19, 2011 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by SHAWN MICHAEL RIDLEY on behalf of EATON CORPORATION, AS SII TO EATON ELECTRICAL INC. AND CUTLER-HAMMER INC. with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(RIDLEY, SHAWN)
August 18, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by ALLISON M. LOW on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY with Certificate of Service(LOW, ALLISON)
August 10, 2011 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI on behalf of CRANE CO. with Certificate of Service(ZUKOWSKI, MICHAEL)
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT IN THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, A STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 9/6/11 AT 2PM.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/8/11. 8/8/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED (dp, )
June 24, 2011 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by VIACOM, INC..(JAMISON, KEVIN)
June 24, 2011 Filing 11 NOTICE by VIACOM, INC. of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint and Jury Demand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CBS' Answer to First Amended Complaint (14 pages), #2 Exhibit 2 - CBS' Demand for Jury Trial and Estimate of Length of Trial (4 pages))(JAMISON, KEVIN)
March 24, 2011 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by RESHMA A. BAJAJ on behalf of J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. (BAJAJ, RESHMA)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED THAT THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, A STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, ON TUESDAY, JANUARY 11TH AT 2:00 PM IN COURTROOM 11A, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/16/10. 12/20/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jaa, ) ***DOCKETED ON ERROR***. Modified on 12/20/2010 (jaa, ).
September 25, 2010 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LINDA OLSCHEWSKE, THOMAS R. OLSCHEWSKE, ELLAMAE PIKE regarding the Service of Administrative Order #12 Report and Attachments on September 17, 2010 (ANDERS, FRANK)
August 30, 2010 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON WAYNE RUBIN on behalf of EATON CORPORATION, AS SII TO EATON ELECTRICAL INC. AND CUTLER-HAMMER INC. with Certificate of Service(RUBIN, JASON)
August 30, 2010 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by EATON CORPORATION, AS SII TO EATON ELECTRICAL INC. AND CUTLER-HAMMER INC..(RUBIN, JASON)
August 30, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CY GOLDBERG on behalf of EATON CORPORATION, AS SII TO EATON ELECTRICAL INC. AND CUTLER-HAMMER INC. with Certificate of Service(GOLDBERG, CY)
August 30, 2010 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by EATON CORPORATION, AS SII TO EATON ELECTRICAL INC. AND CUTLER-HAMMER INC..(GOLDBERG, CY)
August 20, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL (va, )
August 20, 2010 Filing 2 AMENDED ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11 THAT THE MODIFICATIONS TO THE EXISTING PROCEDURES FOR THE PROCESSING OF CASES, DOCKETS, PLEADINGS AND ORDERS IN MDL 875 CASES ARE ADOPTED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (va, )
August 20, 2010 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER NO. 817 THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS ORDERED TO INITIATE THE PROCEDURES FOR THE TRANSFER OF MDL 875 CASES FROM THE U.S.D.C. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THIS COURT'S ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (va, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OLSCHEWSKE et al v. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANDCO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH AMERICAN TIRE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUCYRUS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSSENDALE-RUBOIL COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINGLEDORFF'S, INC.
Represented By: KEVIN DOUGLAS JAMISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STUART-WESTERN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SILVER LINE PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. SPRING & BUMPER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAITE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.
Represented By: JOHN K SON
Represented By: EVAN C. NELSON
Represented By: NICOLE ELISABET GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. KRASNE MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORGWARNER MORSE TBC, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHEELING BRAKE BLOCK MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMSCO ASBESTOS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY
Represented By: ANNE K. BRAUER
Represented By: ANTHONY MICHAEL BLALOCK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. HAKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: ALLISON M. LOW
Represented By: CHARLES T. SHELDON
Represented By: DEREK S. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOLDED INDUSTRIAL FRICTION CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELL ASBESTOS MINES LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN CONFERENCE OF GOVERNMENTAL INDUSTRIAL HYGIENISTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LASCO BRAKE PRODUCTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA COMPANIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRASSBESTOS BRAKE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: PETER V. MARKS, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS
Represented By: EVAN C. NELSON
Represented By: NICOLE ELISABET GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORCES MANUFACTURING CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAREMONT CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIBRE & METAL PRODUCTS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING CO., INC.
Represented By: MIRNA JEFTIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTERN MACARTHUR COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION
Represented By: JOSEPH BLAISE ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOM, INC.
Represented By: KEVIN DOUGLAS JAMISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.
Represented By: RESHMA A. BAJAJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUTO FRICTION CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNDERWRITERS LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNEUMO ABEX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACARTHUR COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITESET MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUTO SPECIAL MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSAL FRICTION MATERIALS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTERN ASBESTOS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON CORPORATION, AS SII TO EATON ELECTRICAL INC. AND CUTLER-HAMMER INC.
Represented By: NAOMI FRIBOURG
Represented By: SHAWN MICHAEL RIDLEY
Represented By: CY GOLDBERG
Represented By: CHRISTINA MARIE HELWIG
Represented By: JASON WAYNE RUBIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHERN FRICTION MATERIALS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BUDD COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL TRANSPORT SUPPLY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASBESTOS MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LJ. MILEY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA OLSCHEWSKE
Represented By: DAVID R. DONADIO
Represented By: KIMBERLY J.W.J. CHU
Represented By: KIMBERLY L. MEYER
Represented By: RICHARD MARTIN GRANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELLAMAE PIKE
Represented By: DAVID R. DONADIO
Represented By: KIMBERLY J.W.J. CHU
Represented By: RICHARD MARTIN GRANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS R. OLSCHEWSKE
Represented By: DAVID R. DONADIO
Represented By: KIMBERLY J.W.J. CHU
Represented By: RICHARD MARTIN GRANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?