CURRENT v. SESSIONS et al
Plaintiff: JOHN CURRENT
Defendant: ATTORNEY GENERAL JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, PENNSYLVANIA STATE POLICE, RONALD B. TURK, JOSHUA SHAPIRO, THOMAS W. WOLF, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CHRISTOPHER WRAY, UNITED STATES BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, THOMAS E. BRANDON, TYREE BLOCKER and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2017cv05385
Filed: November 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Bucks
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JOHN CURRENT As To all defendants (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE COMMONWEALTH DEFENDANTS, TYREE BLOCKER, PENNSYLVANIA STATE POLICE, JOSHUA SHAPIRO AND THOMAS W. WOLF, ARE GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL 1/16/2018, TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT.SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 1/2/2018. 1/3/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(amas)
January 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN R. KOVATIS on behalf of TYREE BLOCKER, PENNSYLVANIA STATE POLICE, JOSHUA SHAPIRO, THOMAS W. WOLF with Certificate of Service(KOVATIS, STEPHEN)
December 13, 2017 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN CURRENT re: Brad Schuman served Summons and Complaint upon TYREE BLOCKER, PENNSYLVANIA STATE POLICE, JOSHUA SHAPIRO, THOMAS W. WOLF by Personal Service. TYREE BLOCKER served on 12/13/2017, answer due 1/3/2018; PENNSYLVANIA STATE POLICE served on 12/13/2017, answer due 1/3/2018; JOSHUA SHAPIRO served on 12/13/2017, answer due 2/2/2018; THOMAS W. WOLF served on 12/13/2017, answer due 2/2/2018. (GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)
December 4, 2017 Filing 2 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney, Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (kw, )
November 29, 2017 Summons Issued as to TYREE BLOCKER, THOMAS E. BRANDON, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, PENNSYLVANIA STATE POLICE, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, JOSHUA SHAPIRO, RONALD B. TURK, UNITED STATES BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES, THOMAS W. WOLF, CHRISTOPHER WRAY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General 12 Forwarded To: Counsel, One given to AUSA on 12/1/17 (jwl, )
November 29, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TYREE BLOCKER, THOMAS E. BRANDON, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, PENNSYLVANIA STATE POLICE, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, JOSHUA SHAPIRO, RONALD B. TURK, UNITED STATES BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, THOMAS W. WOLF, CHRISTOPHER WRAY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 169674.), filed by JOHN CURRENT.(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CURRENT v. SESSIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATTORNEY GENERAL JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA STATE POLICE
Represented By: STEPHEN R. KOVATIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD B. TURK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA SHAPIRO
Represented By: STEPHEN R. KOVATIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS W. WOLF
Represented By: STEPHEN R. KOVATIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER WRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS E. BRANDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TYREE BLOCKER
Represented By: STEPHEN R. KOVATIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN CURRENT
Represented By: MICHAEL P. GOTTLIEB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?