THOMAS v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Plaintiff: EVERETT KEITH THOMAS and KEITH THOMAS
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, WARDEN DELANEY, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER COLE and NURSE JANE DOE
Case Number: 2:2019cv00090
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 18 PLAINTIFF EVERETT KEITH THOMAS' SWORN AFFIDAVIT.(jpd, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 17 PLAINTIFF EVERETT KEITH THOMAS' STATEMENT.(jpd, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 16 SWORN AFFIDAVIT OF EVERETT KEITH THOMAS. (jpd, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Returned Unexecuted by EVERETT KEITH THOMAS as to COLE. (jpd, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by COLE.(MILLER, MICHAEL)
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DELANEY. Brief and Certificate of Service.(MILLER, MICHAEL)
February 7, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EVERETT KEITH THOMAS re: U.S. MARSHAL SEVICE served Summons and Complaint upon CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DELANEY by Personal. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA served on 1/30/2019, answer due 2/20/2019; DELANEY served on 1/30/2019, answer due 2/20/2019. (jpd, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by EVERETT KEITH THOMAS(jpd, )
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL (DOC. NO. 9) IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND A COPY OF THIS COURT'S ORDER DATED 1/10/19 TO PLAINTIFF AT THE ADDRESS LISTED ON THE DOCKET. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/17/19. 1/18/19 ENTERED AND COPY OF ORDERS MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF(jpd )
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 PLAINTIFF EVERETT KEITH THOMAS' MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL.(jpd, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 PLAINTIFF EVERETT KEITH THOMAS' STATEMENT.(jpd, )
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL (DOC. NO. 5) IS GRANTED. THIS CASE SHALL BE REFERRED TO THE CLERKS OFFICE UNTIL 3/11/19 SO ATTEMPTS CAN BE MADE TO OBTAIN COUNSEL THROUGH THE PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS PANEL. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ALL DEADLINES SHALL BE STAYED UNITL EITHER COUSEL HAS BEEN APPOINTED OR 3/11/19 WHICHEVER OCCURS FIRST. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 1/10/19. 1/11/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINITFF, PRO SE LAW CLERKS AND E-MAILED. (jpd )
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL PAY THE FULL FILING FEE OF $350.00 IN INSTALLMENTS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FORWARD A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE WARDEN OF C.F.C.F. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES, SERVICE OF THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SHALL BE MADE UPON THE DEFENDANTS BY THE U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 1/8/19. 1/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF. (jpd )
January 8, 2019 3 Summons Issued as to CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, COLE, DELANEY. Forwarded To: U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE on 1/9/19 (jpd, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL FILED BY EVERETT KEITH THOMAS.(ahf)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by EVERETT KEITH THOMAS. (ahf)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against JAMES MCCANTA, filed by EVERETT KEITH THOMAS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ahf)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY EVERETT KEITH THOMAS.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THOMAS v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: MICHAEL R. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN DELANEY
Represented By: MICHAEL R. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER COLE
Represented By: MICHAEL R. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVERETT KEITH THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEITH THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?