WILLIAMS v. BENSHETRIT et al
Plaintiff: DEON WILLIAMS
Defendant: ABRAHAM BENSHETRIT and THE SALTZ DENTAL CENTER
Case Number: 2:2019cv00797
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Hearing on Discovery HEARING ON OBJECTIONS TO SUBPOENAS (AND ANY OTHER OPEN DISCOVERY ISSUE) IS RESET FOR 5/22/2019 03:00 PM IN COURTROOM 3A BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON (THIS HEARING ORIGINALLY SCHEDULED FOR 5/2/19).(lds, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REGARDING A Settlement Conference held on 4/22/19. (jl, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE VIA TELEPHONE SET FOR 12/19/2019 04:30 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO INITIATE THE CALL. (CHAMBERS PH. 267-299-7790)(dp, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 21 Objections by DEON WILLIAMS to Subpoenas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(GINSBURG, BRUCE)
April 18, 2019 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON Telephone Conference held on 4/18/19 (jl, )
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT A HEARING ON THE DISPUTE AS TO PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO SUBPEONAS WILL BE HELD ON 5/2/19 ON 11:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 3A; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/18/19. 4/18/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing:TELEPHONE CONFERENCE REGARDING THE SCHEDULING OF A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/22/2019 09:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO INITIATE THE CALL. (CHAMBERS PH. 267-299-7790)(dp, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RE: PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO SUBPOENAS SET FOR 4/18/2019 11:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF WILL INITIATE THIS TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AND WHEN ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, CALL CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7520.(lds, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 16 PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO SUBPOENAS by DEON WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(GINSBURG, BRUCE)
April 8, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON Pretrial Conference held on 4/8/19. (jl, )
April 8, 2019 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: TRIAL POOL SET FOR 4/1/2020. (jl, )
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THE DISCOVERY DEADLINE IS 1/30/20. MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID STRAWBRIDGE WILL CONTACT COUNSEL AS TO WHETHER SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS HAVE TAKEN PLACE AND TO SCHEDULE A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. DEADLINE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 2/28/20. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM ARE DUE BY 3/10/20. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM ARE DUE BY 3/30/20. DATE FOR TRIAL OR ENTRY INTO TRIAL POOL IS 4/1/20; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/8/19. 4/8/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL O. PITT on behalf of THE SALTZ DENTAL CENTER (PITT, MICHAEL)
March 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL E. PEEL on behalf of THE SALTZ DENTAL CENTER (PEEL, PAUL)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/8/2019 11:45 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF WILL INITIATE THE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AND WHEN ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, CALL CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7520. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(lds, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by BRENDAN F. MULLIGAN on behalf of DEON WILLIAMS (MULLIGAN, BRENDAN)
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint of Plaintiff with Affirmative Defenses by ABRAHAM BENSHETRIT. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FARRELL, JOHN)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DEON WILLIAMS. THE SALTZ DENTAL CENTER waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (GINSBURG, BRUCE)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DEON WILLIAMS. ABRAHAM BENSHETRIT waiver sent on 2/28/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (GINSBURG, BRUCE)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL C. FREEDMAN on behalf of ABRAHAM BENSHETRIT (FREEDMAN, RACHEL)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN C. FARRELL on behalf of ABRAHAM BENSHETRIT with Jury Demand(FARRELL, JOHN)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF MERIT by DEON WILLIAMS. (GINSBURG, BRUCE)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF MERIT by DEON WILLIAMS. (GINSBURG, BRUCE)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF MERIT by DEON WILLIAMS. (GINSBURG, BRUCE)
February 25, 2019 Summons Issued as to ABRAHAM BENSHETRIT, THE SALTZ DENTAL CENTER. Two Forwarded To: Counsel on 2/25/19 (jwl, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABRAHAM BENSHETRIT, THE SALTZ DENTAL CENTER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 192949.), filed by DEON WILLIAMS.(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. BENSHETRIT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABRAHAM BENSHETRIT
Represented By: RACHEL C. BEKERMAN
Represented By: JOHN C. FARRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE SALTZ DENTAL CENTER
Represented By: MICHAEL O. PITT
Represented By: PAUL E. PEEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEON WILLIAMS
Represented By: BRUCE MARTIN GINSBURG
Represented By: BRENDAN F. MULLIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?