Connecticut et al v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: State of North Dakota, State of North Carolina, State of Minnesota, State of Florida, State of Connecticut, State of New Mexico, State of Missouri, State of Vermont, State of Washington, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Oregon, Commonwealth of Virginia, Commonwealth (of) Pennsylvania, State of Colorado, State of Maryland, State of Illinois, State of Arizona, State of Alabama, State of Nevada, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Iowa, State of Wisconsin, State of Ohio, State of Mississippi, State of Oklahoma, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Utah, State of Tennessee, State of Michigan, State of Kansas, State of New Jersey, State of Alaska, State of Rhode Island, State of Delaware, State of Indiana, State of West Virginia, State of Louisiana, State of Maine, State of New York, State of Montana, State of Idaho, State of Hawaii, Commonwealth of Kentucky, TERRITORY OF GUAM, STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA, STATE OF WYOMING, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, STATE OF ARKANSAS, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF GEORGIA, COMMONWEALTH OF THE NORTHERN MARIANA ISLANDS and TERRITORY OF AMERICAN SAMOA
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., Richard Rogerson, WOCKHARDT USA LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., SANDOZ INC, Marc Falkin, ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC., Inc Pfizer, David Rekenthaler, TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC., Armando Kellum, APOTEX CORP., Zydus Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., Konstantin Ostaficiuk, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., NISHA PATEL, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, David Berthold, GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC, USA, UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, Maureen Cavanaugh, KEVIN GREEN, AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC., Ara Aprahamian, Jill Nailor, BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., James Grauso, JAMES BROWN, GREENSTONE LLC, Tracy Sullivan Divalerio, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., James Nesta, ROBIN HATOSY, AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC and PFIZER INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02407
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY D. SMITH on behalf of ROBIN HATOSY with Certificate of Service(SMITH, JEFFREY)
January 10, 2020 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by ALICE M. BERGEN on behalf of ROBIN HATOSY with Certificate of Service(BERGEN, ALICE)
January 7, 2020 Filing 115 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ERICA A. KOSCHER on behalf of State of Washington(KOSCHER, ERICA)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER THAT THE MOTION IS APPROVED. THE DEADLINE FOR THE PLAINTIFF STATES TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT PFIZER INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY IS EXTENDED TO 1/28/2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 12/9/2019. 12/10/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE 1165 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN F. HOLT on behalf of MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC with Certificate of Service(HOLT, BENJAMIN)
December 9, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD J. OLSZEWSKI on behalf of State of Ohio with Certificate of Service(OLSZEWSKI, EDWARD)
December 9, 2019 Filing 111 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant Pfizer's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Stay Discovery filed by State of Ohio.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MCKINLEY, MATTHEW)
December 9, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW K. MCKINLEY on behalf of State of Ohio with Certificate of Service(MCKINLEY, MATTHEW)
November 29, 2019 Filing 109 MOTION to Stay Discovery from Pfizer Pending Resolution of Its Motion to Dismiss filed by Inc Pfizer.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ilana H. Eisenstein, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(FABENS-LASSEN, BEN)
November 29, 2019 Filing 108 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Inc Pfizer.Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FABENS-LASSEN, BEN)
November 5, 2019 Filing 107 NOTICE by JAMES BROWN Notice of Appearance Substitution and Withdrawal of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KRANTZ, LARRY)
November 1, 2019 Filing 106 AMENDED COMPLAINT against TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.;ACTAVIS HOLDCO US, INC.;ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.;AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.;AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC;APOTEX CORP.;ARA APRAHAMIAN;AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC.;DAVID BERTHOLD;BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.;JAMES (JIM) BROWN;MAUREEN CAVANAUGH;TRACY SULLIVAN DIVALERIO;DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.;MARC FALKIN;GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA;JAMES (JIM) GRAUSO;KEVIN GREEN;GREENSTONE LLC;ROBIN HATOSY;ARMANDO KELLUM;LANNETT COMPANY, INC.;LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.;MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.;JILL NAILOR;JAMES (JIM) NESTA;PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC.;NISHA PATEL;PFIZER, INC.;KONSTANTIN OSTAFICIUK;DAVID REKENTHALER;RICHARD (RICK) ROGERSON;SANDOZ, INC.;TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC;WOCKHARDT USA LLC;ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC., filed by State of Oklahoma, State of Ohio, State of Mississippi, State of Florida, State of New Jersey, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of West Virginia, State of Nevada, State of Minnesota, State of Illinois, State of North Dakota, Commonwealth (of) Pennsylvania, State of Indiana, State of New York, State of Tennessee, State of Vermont, State of Iowa, State of Louisiana, State of Maine, State of Wisconsin, State of Michigan, State of Alabama, State of Maryland, State of Connecticut, State of North Carolina, State of New Mexico, State of Utah, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Nebraska, State of Missouri, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of Montana, State of Kansas, State of Delaware, State of Alaska, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Idaho, State of Hawaii, State of South Carolina, State of Arizona, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Washington, State of Colorado, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA, STATE OF GEORGIA, TERRITORY OF AMERICAN SAMOA, STATE OF WYOMING, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, STATE OF ARKANSAS, TERRITORY OF GUAM, COMMONWEALTH OF THE NORTHERN MARIANA ISLANDS.(kp, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS M. SYDOW on behalf of State of New Mexico with Certificate of Service(SYDOW, NICHOLAS)
November 1, 2019 Filing 104 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by State of Colorado..(SMITH, ABIGAIL)
September 24, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID REICHENBERG on behalf of Richard Rogerson (REICHENBERG, DAVID)
September 24, 2019 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL E. LOWENSTEIN on behalf of Maureen Cavanaugh with Certificate of Service(LOWENSTEIN, MICHAEL)
September 23, 2019 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by ELLEN MOSSMAN on behalf of David Rekenthaler with Certificate of Service(MOSSMAN, ELLEN)
September 23, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS H LEE, II on behalf of David Rekenthaler with Certificate of Service(LEE, THOMAS)
September 20, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by R. BRENDAN FEE on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC, USA with Certificate of Service(FEE, R.)
September 20, 2019 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES A. BACKSTROM on behalf of Marc Falkin with Certificate of Service(BACKSTROM, JAMES)
September 20, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by ARIO FAZLI on behalf of LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. with Certificate of Service(FAZLI, ARIO)
September 20, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by KATIE ROSE GLYNN on behalf of LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. with Certificate of Service(GLYNN, KATIE)
September 20, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by ZAREMA A. JARAMILLO on behalf of LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. with Certificate of Service(JARAMILLO, ZAREMA)
September 20, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by LEIV H. BLAD on behalf of LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. with Certificate of Service(BLAD, LEIV)
September 20, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by ALYSSA C. HUGHES on behalf of NISHA PATEL with Certificate of Service(HUGHES, ALYSSA)
September 20, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by NEAL A. BRACKETT on behalf of NISHA PATEL with Certificate of Service(BRACKETT, NEAL)
September 20, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by LARRY A. MACKEY on behalf of NISHA PATEL with Certificate of Service(MACKEY, LARRY)
September 19, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY LOVE on behalf of NISHA PATEL with Certificate of Service(LOVE, BRADLEY)
September 17, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY J. MASTERS on behalf of David Rekenthaler with Certificate of Service(MASTERS, JEFFREY)
September 17, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by CLIFFORD KATZ on behalf of WOCKHARDT USA LLC with Certificate of Service(KATZ, CLIFFORD)
September 17, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by DAMON W. SUDEN on behalf of WOCKHARDT USA LLC with Certificate of Service(SUDEN, DAMON)
September 17, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM A. ESCOBAR on behalf of WOCKHARDT USA LLC with Certificate of Service(ESCOBAR, WILLIAM)
September 17, 2019 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN on behalf of PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(SCHMIDTLEIN, JOHN)
September 17, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS P. REILLY on behalf of Maureen Cavanaugh with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(REILLY, THOMAS)
September 17, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by ANNE ROLLINS on behalf of Maureen Cavanaugh with Certificate of Service(ROLLINS, ANNE)
September 17, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS H. SUDDATH, JR on behalf of Maureen Cavanaugh with Certificate of Service(SUDDATH, THOMAS)
September 17, 2019 Filing 81 Entry of Appearance for James Grauso (CONNOLLY, ROBERT) Modified on 9/30/2019 (kp, ).
September 16, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN AARON MILLER on behalf of Richard Rogerson (MILLER, STEPHEN)
September 16, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by CALLI JO PADILLA on behalf of Richard Rogerson (PADILLA, CALLI)
September 16, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN THOMAS BECKER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BECKER, RYAN)
September 16, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD E. ARTH on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(ARTH, GERALD)
September 16, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by AMY B. CARVER on behalf of Tracy Sullivan Divalerio with Certificate of Service(CARVER, AMY)
September 16, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE M. RECKER on behalf of JAMES BROWN with Certificate of Service(RECKER, CATHERINE)
September 16, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT E. WELSH, JR on behalf of KEVIN GREEN with Certificate of Service(WELSH, ROBERT)
September 13, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ERIN R ELDRIDGE on behalf of State of Minnesota(ELDRIDGE, ERIN)
September 12, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by LISA MANNING on behalf of Konstantin Ostaficiuk with Certificate of Service(MANNING, LISA)
August 21, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD SMITH SCHEIDEMAN on behalf of GREENSTONE LLC, Inc Pfizer with Certificate of Service(SCHEIDEMAN, EDWARD)
August 21, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by SHREY SHARMA on behalf of Jill Nailor with Certificate of Service(SHARMA, SHREY)
August 21, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA ELIZABETH MILLER on behalf of Jill Nailor with Certificate of Service(MILLER, LAURA)
August 21, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL GERARD CONSIDINE on behalf of Jill Nailor with Certificate of Service(CONSIDINE, MICHAEL)
August 20, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by LISA ANNE PETERSON on behalf of Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. with Certificate of Service(PETERSON, LISA)
August 20, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by NICOLE L. CASTLE on behalf of Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. with Certificate of Service(CASTLE, NICOLE)
August 20, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID L. HANSELMAN on behalf of Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. with Certificate of Service(HANSELMAN, DAVID)
August 20, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL M. THOMPSON on behalf of Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. with Certificate of Service(THOMPSON, PAUL)
August 20, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by RAYMOND A. JACOBSEN on behalf of Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. with Certificate of Service(JACOBSEN, RAYMOND)
August 6, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by BEN C. FABENS-LASSEN on behalf of GREENSTONE LLC, Inc Pfizer with Certificate of Service(FABENS-LASSEN, BEN)
August 6, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by ILANA H. EISENSTEIN on behalf of GREENSTONE LLC, Inc Pfizer with Certificate of Service(EISENSTEIN, ILANA)
August 5, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS J. INGALLS on behalf of James Nesta with Certificate of Service(INGALLS, THOMAS)
August 5, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by S. REBECCA BRODEY on behalf of James Nesta with Certificate of Service(BRODEY, S.)
August 5, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER MICHAEL RYAN on behalf of James Nesta with Certificate of Service(RYAN, PETER)
August 5, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by L. BARRETT BOSS on behalf of James Nesta with Certificate of Service(BOSS, L.)
July 30, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by HENRY E. KLINGEMAN on behalf of David Berthold with Certificate of Service(KLINGEMAN, HENRY)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION WITH REGARD TO WAIVER OF SERVICE OF AND RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF STATES' 5/10/2019 COMPLAINT IS APPROVED. THE DEADLINE FOR THE STIPULATING DEFENDANTS TO MOVE AGAINST, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND IS ADJOURNED UNTIL SUCH TIME THE COURT ENTERS A CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER SETTING SUCH A SCHEDULE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 7/25/2019. 7/25/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO. 1058 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by STACEY ANNE MAHONEY on behalf of BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MAHONEY, STACEY)
July 23, 2019 Filing 53 STIPULATION TO WAIVE SERVICE AND EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO THE PLAINTIFF STATES MAY 10, 2019 COMPLAINT by SANDOZ INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(MORGENSTERN, SAUL) Modified on 7/24/2019 (kp, ).
July 9, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by TRAVIS A. KENNEDY on behalf of State of Washington with Certificate of Service(KENNEDY, TRAVIS)
June 25, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by CHERYL FAYE HIEMSTRA on behalf of State of Oregon (HIEMSTRA, CHERYL)
June 24, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by DOUGLAS L. DAVIS on behalf of State of West Virginia with Certificate of Service(DAVIS, DOUGLAS)
June 21, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by LYNETTE R. BAKKER on behalf of State of Kansas (BAKKER, LYNETTE)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF STATES' MOTION TO UNSEAL (DOC. NO. 3 IN 19-CV-2407) IS GRANTED. THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO UNSEAL THE UNREDACTED VERSION OF THE COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. 3 IN 19-CV-2407). SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 6/21/2019. 6/21/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (SEE PAPER # 1024 IN 16-MD-2724) (ems)
June 21, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL H. LEFF on behalf of Commonwealth of Massachusetts with Certificate of Service(LEFF, DANIEL)
June 20, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by SHEREECE DENDY-SANDERS on behalf of State of Nebraska with Certificate of Service(DENDY-SANDERS, SHEREECE)
June 20, 2019 Filing 45 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Unseal Document filed by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MCENROE, WILLIAM)
June 19, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by SAUL P MORGENSTERN on behalf of SANDOZ INC with Certificate of Service(MORGENSTERN, SAUL)
June 19, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA S. SHORES on behalf of SANDOZ INC with Certificate of Service(SHORES, LAURA)
June 19, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by MARGARET A. ROGERS on behalf of SANDOZ INC with Certificate of Service(ROGERS, MARGARET)
June 19, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA C CROUSHORE on behalf of SANDOZ INC with Certificate of Service(CROUSHORE, AMANDA)
June 19, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by ADA VICTORIA ANON on behalf of SANDOZ INC with Certificate of Service(ANON, ADA)
June 19, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG on behalf of SANDOZ INC with Certificate of Service(ROSENBERG, KATHRYN)
June 19, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES R. MUNSON on behalf of State of Montana with Certificate of Service(MUNSON, CHARLES)
June 18, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by ERICA A. KOSCHER on behalf of State of Washington (KOSCHER, ERICA)
June 17, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by MAX M. MILLER on behalf of State of Iowa with Certificate of Service(MILLER, MAX)
June 17, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by REBECCA MAGILL MCCORMACK on behalf of State of South Carolina with Certificate of Service(MCCORMACK, REBECCA)
June 17, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by CLARK C. KIRKLAND, JR on behalf of State of South Carolina with Certificate of Service(KIRKLAND, CLARK)
June 14, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN K OLSON on behalf of State of Idaho with Certificate of Service(OLSON, JOHN)
June 13, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by ABIGAIL U. WOOD on behalf of Commonwealth (of) Pennsylvania with Certificate of Service(WOOD, ABIGAIL)
June 13, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by CARL J HAMMAKER, III on behalf of State of Michigan (HAMMAKER, CARL)
June 11, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by CHIRSTOPHER PAGE WILSON on behalf of TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. with Certificate of Service(WILSON, CHIRSTOPHER)
June 11, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIK THOMAS KOONS on behalf of TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. with Certificate of Service(KOONS, ERIK)
June 11, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MARTIN TALADAY on behalf of TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. with Certificate of Service(TALADAY, JOHN)
June 10, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL SCHWALBERT on behalf of State of Missouri (SCHWALBERT, MICHAEL)
June 10, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT L. HUBBARD on behalf of State of New York (HUBBARD, ROBERT)
June 10, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH C. MEYER on behalf of State of Minnesota with Certificate of Service(MEYER, JOSEPH)
June 10, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN R ELDRIDGE on behalf of State of Minnesota with Certificate of Service(ELDRIDGE, ERIN)
June 7, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by J. GORDON COONEY, JR on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. with Certificate of Service(COONEY, J.)
June 7, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN J. PEASE on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. with Certificate of Service(PEASE, JOHN)
June 7, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by ALISON TANCHYK on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. with Certificate of Service(TANCHYK, ALISON)
June 7, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA B. ROBINSON on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. with Certificate of Service(ROBINSON, AMANDA)
June 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAELA DRAGALIN on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. with Certificate of Service(DRAGALIN, MICHAELA)
June 6, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID M. MAX on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MAX, DAVID)
June 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH B. DAVIS on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(DAVIS, SETH)
June 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH A. MOSKOWITZ on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MOSKOWITZ, SETH)
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by SHERON KORPUS on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KORPUS, SHERON)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by HECTOR TORRES on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(TORRES, HECTOR)
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC E. KASOWITZ on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KASOWITZ, MARC)
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Unseal Document filed by State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Florida, State of Hawaii, State of Idaho, State of Illinois, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Maine, State of Maryland, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of Oregon, Commonwealth (of) Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Rhode Island, State of South Carolina, State of Tennessee, State of Utah, State of Vermont, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of Washington, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin.Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(MARTELLA, LAURA)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM T MCENROE on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. with Certificate of Service(MCENROE, WILLIAM)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:19-cv-00710. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 30, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Peterson, M) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/4/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols, MDL Panel on 5/30/2019.(Peterson, M) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/4/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Johnson Martella on behalf of State of Connecticut (Martella, Laura) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/4/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Standing Protective Order, #2 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Complaint filed by State of Connecticut, #1 Complaint, filed by State of Connecticut, State of Iowa, State of Missouri, State of Michigan, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, State of North Carolina, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Ohio, State of Oregon, State of North Dakota, State of Delaware, State of Louisiana, State of Wisconsin, State of Arizona, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Florida, State of New Jersey, State of Minnesota, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of South Carolina, State of Rhode Island, State of New York, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Maryland, State of Mississippi, State of Colorado, State of Hawaii, State of Utah, State of Kansas, State of Alabama, State of Oklahoma, State of Alaska, State of Illinois, State of Washington, State of Indiana, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of Vermont, State of Idaho, State of New Mexico, State of Nebraska, State of Maine, State of Tennessee, State of West Virginia, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Sealed Document filed by State of Connecticut, #5 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 05/13/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/4/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/10/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/4/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/10/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/4/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/9/2019. Discovery due by 11/9/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/14/2019. Signed by Clerk on 05/10/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/4/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Sealed Document: Non-Public Version by State of Connecticut re #2 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Complaint. (Murphy, Tatihana) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/4/2019.] (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/6/2019: #1 main doc) (kp, ).
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Complaint by State of Connecticut. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Murphy, Tatihana) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/4/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing fee received from Attorney General: $ 400.00, receipt number DCTX00015580 (Murphy, Tatihana) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/4/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by State of Oklahoma, State of Ohio, State of Mississippi, State of Florida, State of New Jersey, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of West Virginia, State of Nevada, State of Minnesota, State of Illinois, State of North Dakota, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, State of Indiana, State of New York, State of Tennessee, State of Vermont, State of Iowa, State of Louisiana, State of Maine, State of Wisconsin, State of Michigan, State of Alabama, State of Maryland, State of Connecticut, State of North Carolina, State of New Mexico, State of Utah, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Nebraska, State of Missouri, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of Montana, State of Kansas, State of Delaware, State of Alaska, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Idaho, State of Hawaii, State of South Carolina, State of Arizona, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Washington, State of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Attachments)(Murphy, Tatihana) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/4/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connecticut et al v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of North Dakota
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of North Carolina
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: ERIN R ELDRIDGE
Represented By: JOSEPH C. MEYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Florida
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Connecticut
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: NICHOLAS M. SYDOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Missouri
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: MICHAEL SCHWALBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Vermont
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: ERICA A. KOSCHER
Represented By: TRAVIS A. KENNEDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nebraska
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: SHEREECE DENDY-SANDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of South Carolina
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: CLARK C. KIRKLAND, JR.
Represented By: REBECCA MAGILL MCCORMACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oregon
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: CHERYL FAYE HIEMSTRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth (of) Pennsylvania
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: ABIGAIL U. WOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Colorado
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: ABIGAIL L. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maryland
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Illinois
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Arizona
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Alabama
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nevada
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: DANIEL H. LEFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Iowa
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: MAX M. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Ohio
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: EDWARD J. OLSZEWSKI
Represented By: MATTHEW K. MCKINLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Mississippi
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oklahoma
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Utah
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Tennessee
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Michigan
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: CARL J HAMMAKER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Kansas
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: LYNETTE R. BAKKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Jersey
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Alaska
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Delaware
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Indiana
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of West Virginia
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: DOUGLAS L. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Louisiana
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maine
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New York
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: ROBERT L. HUBBARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Montana
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: CHARLES R. MUNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Idaho
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: JOHN K OLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Hawaii
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRITORY OF GUAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF WYOMING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF ARKANSAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF THE NORTHERN MARIANA ISLANDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRITORY OF AMERICAN SAMOA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: SHERON KORPUS
Represented By: HECTOR TORRES
Represented By: DAVID M. MAX
Represented By: MARC E. KASOWITZ
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Rogerson
Represented By: DAVID REICHENBERG
Represented By: STEPHEN AARON MILLER
Represented By: CALLI JO PADILLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOCKHARDT USA LLC
Represented By: CLIFFORD KATZ
Represented By: DAMON W. SUDEN
Represented By: WILLIAM A. ESCOBAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANNETT COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: RYAN THOMAS BECKER
Represented By: GERALD E. ARTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ INC
Represented By: MARGARET A. ROGERS
Represented By: LAURA S. SHORES
Represented By: SAUL P MORGENSTERN
Represented By: AMANDA C CROUSHORE
Represented By: ADA VICTORIA ANON
Represented By: KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Falkin
Represented By: JAMES A. BACKSTROM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC.
Represented By: SHERON KORPUS
Represented By: HECTOR TORRES
Represented By: DAVID M. MAX
Represented By: MARC E. KASOWITZ
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inc Pfizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rekenthaler
Represented By: ELLEN MOSSMAN
Represented By: THOMAS H LEE, II
Represented By: JEFFREY J. MASTERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Represented By: ERIK THOMAS KOONS
Represented By: JOHN MARTIN TALADAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Kellum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: KATIE ROSE GLYNN
Represented By: ZAREMA A. JARAMILLO
Represented By: ARIO FAZLI
Represented By: LEIV H. BLAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By: JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Konstantin Ostaficiuk
Represented By: LISA MANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.
Represented By: JOHN J. PEASE
Represented By: MICHAELA DRAGALIN
Represented By: WILLIAM T MCENROE
Represented By: J. GORDON COONEY, JR.
Represented By: ALISON TANCHYK
Represented By: AMANDA B. ROBINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NISHA PATEL
Represented By: BRADLEY LOVE
Represented By: LARRY A. MACKEY
Represented By: NEAL A. BRACKETT
Represented By: ALYSSA C. HUGHES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Berthold
Represented By: HENRY E. KLINGEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC, USA
Represented By: R. BRENDAN FEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Cavanaugh
Represented By: THOMAS P. REILLY
Represented By: THOMAS H. SUDDATH, JR.
Represented By: MICHAEL E. LOWENSTEIN
Represented By: ANNE ROLLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN GREEN
Represented By: ROBERT E. WELSH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ara Aprahamian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Nailor
Represented By: LAURA ELIZABETH MILLER
Represented By: MICHAEL GERARD CONSIDINE
Represented By: SHREY SHARMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Represented By: STACEY ANNE MAHONEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Grauso
Represented By: ROBERT E. CONNOLLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES BROWN
Represented By: CATHERINE M. RECKER
Represented By: LARRY KRANTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENSTONE LLC
Represented By: EDWARD SMITH SCHEIDEMAN
Represented By: ILANA H. EISENSTEIN
Represented By: BEN C. FABENS-LASSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Sullivan Divalerio
Represented By: AMY B. CARVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: NICOLE L. CASTLE
Represented By: RAYMOND A. JACOBSEN
Represented By: LISA ANNE PETERSON
Represented By: DAVID L. HANSELMAN
Represented By: PAUL M. THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Nesta
Represented By: THOMAS J. INGALLS
Represented By: S. REBECCA BRODEY
Represented By: PETER MICHAEL RYAN
Represented By: L. BARRETT BOSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBIN HATOSY
Represented By: ALICE M. BERGEN
Represented By: JEFFREY D. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER INC
Represented By: EDWARD SMITH SCHEIDEMAN
Represented By: ILANA H. EISENSTEIN
Represented By: BEN C. FABENS-LASSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?